Caribbean Hyperbaric Medicine, LLC, et al. v. Meuse, et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Kathryn Kimball Mizelle |
Referred: | Amanda Arnold Sansone |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00684 |
Nature of Suit | 150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 1:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
Barry Michael Meuse
|
|
Plaintiff
Caribbean Hyperbaric Medicine, LLC
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons returned executed
Thu 04/18 11:01 AM
RETURN of service executed on April 17, 2024 by Tyler D. Sexton, Caribbean Hyperbaric Medicine, LLC as to Crystal Creek Healthcare Capital LLC. (Akbik, Mohamad) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/15 4:25 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 9 Order by Caribbean Hyperbaric Medicine, LLC, Tyler D. Sexton. (Akbik, Mohamad) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Wed 04/10 9:10 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: As required by Local Rule 3.03, Plaintiffs must file a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying parties and interested corporations in which any assigned judge may be a shareholder, as well as for other matters that might require consideration of recusal. Plaintiffs must file the foregoing by using the template attached to (Doc. 5 ) (also available on the undersigned's website under the "forms" tab). Plaintiffs must file the Disclosure Statement and Certification no later than April 15, 2024. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 4/10/2024. (CMM) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons returned unexecuted
Mon 04/08 1:57 PM
SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Tyler D. Sexton, Caribbean Hyperbaric Medicine, LLC as to Crystal Creek Healthcare Capital LLC. (Akbik, Mohamad) |
|
7 | 7
service
Proof of service
Mon 04/08 1:55 PM
PROOF of service by Tyler D. Sexton (Akbik, Mohamad) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Wed 04/03 4:58 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: As required by Local Rule 3.03, Plaintiffs must file a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying parties and interested corporations in which any assigned judge may be a shareholder, as well as for other matters that might require consideration of recusal. Plaintiffs must file the foregoing by using the template attached to (Doc. 5 ) (also available on the undersigned's website under the "forms" tab). Plaintiffs must file the Disclosure Statement and Certification no later than April 8, 2024. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 4/3/2024. (CMM) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Standing Order
Tue 03/19 10:47 AM
CIVIL CASE STANDING ORDER. The Parties shall meet and file a Case Management Report using the standard form on the Court's website within forty days after any Defendant appears. Each Party must also file a Corporate Disclosure Statement using the standard template attached to this Order (also available on the undersigned's website under the "forms" tab) within fourteen days after appearing. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 3/19/2024. (CMM) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons issued
Mon 03/18 11:21 AM
SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (ARL) |
|
3 | 3
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/18 10:10 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:24-cv-684-KKM-AAS. (RPB) |
|
misc
Disbursement Voucher / Refund
Mon 03/18 3:45 PM
REFUND for duplicate payment. Receipt number AFLMDC-21877800 refunded in the amount of $ $405.00 paid to Mohamad Akbik.. (NLC) |
||
Sunday, March 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Sun 03/17 2:30 PM
COMPLAINT against Caribbean Hyperbaric Medicine, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21877800) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Akbik, Mohamad) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 03/17 2:26 PM
COMPLAINT against Barry Michael Meuse with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21877799) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Akbik, Mohamad) |