California Northern District Court
Judge:Richard Seeborg
Case #: 3:24-cv-01616
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2024
Terminated:Sep 24, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 11, 2024 2:08 AM PDT
Defendant
Bank of America Corporation
Defendant
Experian Information Services Inc.
Represented By
Kja Harper-Gopaul
Jones Day
contact info
Defendant
TransUnion LLC
Represented By
Jennifer M. Wade
Quilling, Selander, Lownds, Winslett & Moser, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kai Leshne
1534 Filbert St
Oakland, CA 94107
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
Terminated: 07/01/2024
Represented By
Alice M. Hodsden
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info

GPO May 16 2024
ORDER by Judge Seeborg denying 11 Motion for More Definite Statement. (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
GPO Jul 18 2024
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
GPO Sep 24 2024
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)

Docket last updated: 62 minutes ago
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
33 33 1 pgs order Order Tue 09/24 2:16 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION (rslc1, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
32 32 respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Mon 09/23 3:56 PM
Response to Order to Show Cause31 Order, by Experian Information Services Inc.. (Harper-Gopaul, Kja)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
31 31 2 pgs order Order Thu 07/18 11:42 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED (rslc1, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
30 30 minutes Case Management Conference - Further Thu 07/18 10:15 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard Seeborg: Further Case Management Conference held via Zoom on 7/18/2024. Plaintiff did not appear. Court to issue an Order to Show Cause for Plaintiff's failure to appear. Total Time in Court: 1 minute. Court Reporter: Not Reported or Recorded. Pro Se Plaintiff: Kai Leshne. Defendant Attorney: Kja Harper-Gopaul, Jennifer Wade. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/18/2024)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
29 29 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Fri 07/12 10:29 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/rs] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at rscrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 7/17/2024 at 12:00 pm. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) .(cl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
28 28 misc Joint Case Management Statement Thu 07/11 4:30 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Amended) filed by Experian Information Services Inc.. (Harper-Gopaul, Kja)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 07/01 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Against Equifax Information Services LLC by Kai Leshne (Leshne, Kai)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
26 26 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 06/13 10:53 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard Seeborg: Initial Case Management Conference held via Zoom on 6/13/2024. Plaintiff did not appear. A further Case Management Conference is set for July 18, 2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Conference statement is due on July 11, 2024. All parties are advised that they must appear otherwise the case will be dismissed. Total Time in Court: 3 minutes. Court Reporter: Not Reported or Recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: No Appearance. Defendant Attorney: Jennifer Wade, Kja Harper-Gopaul. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/13/2024)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
25 25 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Fri 06/07 10:52 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/13/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/rs] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at rscrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 6/12/2024 at 12:00 pm. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) .(cl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
24 24 misc Joint Case Management Statement Thu 06/06 5:39 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Experian Information Services Inc.. (Harper-Gopaul, Kja)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/05 2:28 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by TransUnion LLC. (Wade, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
22 22 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 06/04 8:22 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Wade, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 01, 2024
21 21 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Sat 06/01 8:09 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Leshne, Kai)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
20 20 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 05/29 10:39 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Harper-Gopaul, Kja)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
19 19 adr ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance after 5/1/2018 Tue 05/28 2:37 PM
ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Plaintiff and Defense Counsel are directed to comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion for More Definite Statement Thu 05/16 10:56 AM
ORDER by Judge Seeborg denying 11 Motion for More Definite Statement. (rslc1, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
17 17 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Wed 05/15 1:39 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byTransUnion LLC. (Wade, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 11 MOTION for More Definite Statement
Thursday, May 09, 2024
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/09 6:43 PM
NOTICE by Equifax Information Services LLC of Settlement (Hodsden, Alice)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/09 6:41 PM
NOTICE by Equifax Information Services LLC of Appearance of Alice M. Hodsden (Hodsden, Alice)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
14 14 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 04/24 5:46 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Experian Information Services Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Services Inc.. (Harper-Gopaul, Kja)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/24 5:38 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Experian Information Services Inc.. (Harper-Gopaul, Kja)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 04/24 9:20 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by TransUnion LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for TransUnion LLC. (Wade, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion More Definite Statement Wed 04/24 9:11 AM
MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by TransUnion LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2024 01:30 PM before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 5/8/2024. Replies due by 5/15/2024.(Wade, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
10 10 service Summons Issued Tue 04/02 1:25 PM
Summons Issued as to Bank of America Corporation, Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Services Inc., TransUnion LLC. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Proposed Summons Tue 04/02 12:48 PM
Proposed Summons. (Leshne, Kai)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
8 8 misc Proposed Summons Mon 04/01 5:38 PM
Proposed Summons.(Leshne, Kai)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Proposed Summons Experian,
Att: 2 Summons Proposed Summons TransUnion,
Att: 3 Summons Proposed Summons Bank of America
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 04/01 7:06 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . SUBMIT ONE SUMMONS FOR ALL DEFENDANTS. USE AN ATTACHMENT TO SUMMONS IF NEEDED TO LIST ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS INFORMATION [err201]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:7 Proposed Summons filed by Kai Leshne (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
7 7 misc Proposed Summons Fri 03/29 3:16 PM
Proposed Summons.(Leshne, Kai)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Proposed Summons Experian Information Services Inc.,
Att: 2 Summons Proposed Summons TransUnion LLC,
Att: 3 Summons Proposed Summons Bank of America Corporation
6 6 misc Proposed Summons Fri 03/29 12:14 PM
Proposed Summons. (Leshne, Kai)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Summons Fri 03/29 12:12 PM
Proposed Summons. (Leshne, Kai)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Fri 03/29 12:10 PM
Proposed Summons. (Leshne, Kai)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Fri 03/29 12:06 PM
Proposed Summons. (Leshne, Kai)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 03/29 12:16 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ONLY ONE SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED PER CASE, USE AN ATTACHMENT TO SUMMONS IF NEEDED TO LIST ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS INFORMATION [err201].This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:5 Proposed Summons filed by Kai Leshne,3 Proposed Summons filed by Kai Leshne,4 Proposed Summons filed by Kai Leshne,6 Proposed Summons filed by Kai Leshne (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
2 2 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Sun 03/17 7:23 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/6/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/13/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (far, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
1 1 64 pgs cmp Complaint Sun 03/17 7:21 AM
COMPLAINT against Bank of America Corporation, Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Services Inc., TransUnion LLC (Filing fee $ 405.). Filed by Kai Leshne.(far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Receipt