Original Case: 1:23-cv-02158

Federal Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cvus-01574
Typecivil us
Nature of Suit140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2024
Terminated:Mar 19, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 20, 2025 5:17 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES
Represented By
Ioana C. Meyer
United States Department of Justice
contact info
Douglas K. Mickle
United States Department of Justice
contact info
Director, Commercial Litigation Branch, Civil Division, U.S. Department of Justice
United States Department of Justice
contact info
Daniel Bertoni
United States Department of Justice
contact info
Patricia M. McCarthy
United States Department of Justice
contact info
Brian M. Boynton
United States Department of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ASSOCIATED ENERGY GROUP, LLC, dba AEG Fuels
Represented By
Stephen E. Ruscus
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Kevin Dorn
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Kaitlyn Elizabeth Toth
BakerHostetler LLP
contact info
Todd John Canni
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
Kevin Barnett
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/20/2025 5:16 AM EDT
Friday, March 15, 2024
1 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 03/12/2024. [990832] Entry of Appearance is due on 03/29/2024. Certificate of Interest is due on 03/29/2024. Docketing Statement is due on 04/15/2024. Appellant's brief is due on 05/14/2024. [ALK] [Entered: 03/15/2024 10:05 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 12 pgs Civil Case Docketed