Hohenberg v. Ferrero USA, Inc
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Marilyn L Huff |
Referred: | Karen S Crawford |
Case #: | 3:11-cv-00205 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Feb 01, 2011 |
Terminated: | Jul 09, 2012 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 17, 2014 10:43 AM PDT |
Defendant
Ferrero USA, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Objector
Courtney Drey
2522 Chambers Road, Suite 100
CA, CA 92780 |
Represented By
|
Objector
Michael E. Hale
107 Spruce Road
Fairfax, CA 94930 |
Represented By
|
Objector
Andrea Pridham
2522 Chambers Road, Suite 100
Tustin, CA 92780 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Athena Hohenberg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Rude-Barbato
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 03 2011
ORDER denying 52 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 8/3/2011. (leh) (jrl). |
Docket last updated: 05/04/2016 12:08 AM PDT |
Tuesday, February 01, 2011 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ferrero USA, Inc, filed by Athena Hohenberg. The new case number is 3:11-cv-205-H-CAB. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo are assigned to the case. (Ronald Marron)(ecs) (cap). | |
2 | 2 Fee for Civil Case Opening: $ 350, receipt number 0974-3261227, Paid on 2/1/2011. (Marron, Ronald) (cap). | |
3 | 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ecs) (cap). |