Town of Braintree v. AGC CHEMICAL AMERICAS, INC. et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | George A Otoole, Jr |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10658 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Norfolk Superior Court, 2482cv0055 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 10:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
AGC INC., f/k/a Asahi Glass Co.
|
|
Defendant
UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, f/k/a United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
NATION FORD CHEMICAL COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
DYNAX CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
DOE DEFENDANTS, JOHN 1-49
|
|
Defendant
DEEPWATER CHEMICALS, INC.
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CHUBB FIRE, LTD.
|
|
Defendant
CHEMICALS INCORPORATED
|
|
Defendant
CHEMDESIGN PRODUCTS, INC.
|
|
Defendant
CARRIER GLOBAL CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
BUCKEYE FIRE EQUIPMENT COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ARKEMA INC.
|
|
Defendant
ARCHROMA U.S., INC.
|
|
Defendant
AGC CHEMICAL AMERICAS, INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
Town of Braintree
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misccs
Electronic Notice re transfer of civil action
Wed 04/17 3:47 PM
Electronic notice to counsel: This civil action has been transferred to the District of South Carolina and assigned civil case number 2:24-cv-01980. (Danieli, Chris) |
|
10 | 10
transfer
Case Transferred Out - MDL Transfer
Wed 04/17 9:12 AM
Case transferred to the District of South Carolina pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 4/15/2024. Case file electronically extracted to the Clerk in that district. (Belpedio, Lisa) |
|
9 | 9
transfer
MDL Transfer Order Received - Out
Wed 04/17 9:10 AM
Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 181 in MDL Case 2873 received from the District of South Carolina requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Belpedio, Lisa) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
State Court Record - no answer filed in state court
Fri 03/29 10:37 AM
STATE COURT Record. (Jeffrey, Jessica) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 03/20 12:44 PM
Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Other Responsive Pleadings to the Complaint . Answer due by 28 days following the JPML issuing a decision. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 03/18 5:09 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Other Responsive Pleadings to the Complaint by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP.(Jeffrey, Jessica) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel
Mon 03/18 3:03 PM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Phillips, Sophie) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel
Mon 03/18 2:54 PM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Mon 03/18 11:37 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Kinsella, Jaylannie) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/18 9:30 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Jeffrey, Jessica) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/18 9:29 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10321082 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Jeffrey, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Norfolk Superior Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Category Form |