Jackson v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Wendy W Berger |
Referred: | Patricia D Barksdale |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00275 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court, 16-02024-000886 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 11:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Dollar Tree Stores, Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Lydia Jackson
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/16 4:27 PM
ORDER re 8 Joint Stipulation for Remand to State Court. Pursuant to the parties' agreement, it is ORDERED that this case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of the Fourth Judicial Circuit, in and for Duval County, Florida, Case Number 16-2024-CA-000886-AXXX-MA. The Court's Order to Show Cause (Doc. 7 ) is DISCHARGED. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/16/2024. (CKS) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation
Thu 04/11 10:34 AM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Remand to State Court by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. (Sausaman, Alison) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order to show cause
Wed 04/10 1:57 PM
ORDERED that Defendant shall SHOW CAUSE on or before April 15, 2024, as to why this case should not be remanded for want of subject-matter jurisdiction. Failure to do so may result in the remand of this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/9/2024. (CKS) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Tue 03/26 5:26 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CKS) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order
Tue 03/26 5:26 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/26/2024. (CKS) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 03/19 3:35 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint Defendant Dollar Tree Stores Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Compliant by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.(Sausaman, Alison) |
|
3 | 3
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/19 11:35 AM
COMPLAINT against Dollar Tree Stores, Inc filed by Lydia Jackson. (filed in State Court on 2/16/2024)(RLK) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/18 12:31 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:24-cv-275-WWB-PDB. (RPB) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/18 12:06 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL Defendant Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. Notice of Removal from Duval County Circuit Court, case number 16-2024-CA-000886 filed in State Court on 2-16-24. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21878937 filed by All Defendants.(Sausaman, Alison) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 State Court COMPLAINT, | ||
Att: 6 State Court Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 State Court Other Documents, | ||
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet |