Uselton v. Commissioner
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas P Barber |
Referred: | Monte C Richardson |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00685 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/02 12:44 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 8:24-cv-685-TPB-MCR. Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams no longer assigned to the case. (NAS) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Thu 03/21 2:23 PM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/19 2:36 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Commissioner of Social Security. (Huberty, Brian) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Tue 03/19 2:31 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Commissioner of Social Security. Related case(s): No (Huberty, Brian) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of substitution of AUSA
Tue 03/19 2:21 PM
Notice of substitution of AUSA. Brian C. Huberty substituting for Nadine DeLuca Elder. (Huberty, Brian) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/18 12:17 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams. New case number: 8:24-cv-685-TPB-NHA. (AA) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/18 10:07 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Cody Uselton. (Atkins, Sarah) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Mon 03/18 10:04 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Sarah Elizabeth Atkins on behalf of Cody Uselton. Lead Counsel: Sarah Atkins. (Atkins, Sarah) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/18 10:00 AM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21878770). The plaintiff declines consent to jurisdiction of the United States magistrate judge filed by Cody Uselton.(Atkins, Sarah) Modified text on 3/18/2024 (KME) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |