Turgut v. Hitachi Rail STS USA, Inc.
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Angel Kelley |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10660 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Suffolk Superior Court, 248cv474 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 11:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Hitachi Rail STS USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Volkan Turgut
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 04/23 2:51 PM
REPLY to Response to7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Hitachi Rail STS USA, Inc.. (Khan, Zinnia) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
Tue 04/09 4:17 PM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING 11 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Lara, Miguel) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Leave to File Document
Tue 04/09 3:39 PM
MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by Hitachi Rail STS USA, Inc..(Shapiro, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Opposition to Motion
Mon 04/08 3:00 PM
Opposition re7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Volkan Turgut.(LeBlanc, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 | ||
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
State Court Record - no answer filed in state court
Thu 03/28 12:37 PM
STATE COURT Record. (Khan, Zinnia) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
14
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Mon 03/25 4:42 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Hitachi Rail STS USA, Inc.. (Khan, Zinnia) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 03/25 4:37 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Hitachi Rail STS USA, Inc..(Khan, Zinnia) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel
Mon 03/18 3:44 PM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Phillips, Sophie) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Mon 03/18 1:28 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Angel Kelley assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Kinsella, Jaylannie) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/18 11:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S Shapiro on behalf of Hitachi Rail STS USA, Inc. (Shapiro, Jeffrey) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/18 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Zinnia K. Khan on behalf of Hitachi Rail STS USA, Inc. (Khan, Zinnia) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/18 11:07 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hitachi Rail STS USA, Inc.. (Khan, Zinnia) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/18 11:05 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hitachi Rail STS USA, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10321387 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Khan, Zinnia) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C |