Shomer v. Rheinscheld
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles Esque Fleming |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00490 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Terminated: | Mar 19, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
oth_evt
Remark
Wed 03/20 8:40 AM
Case electronically transferred to United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio on 3/20/2024. Related document(s)3 . (F,AW) |
||
oth_evt
Remark
Wed 03/20 9:02 AM
Case transferred from Ohio Northern has been opened in Southern District of Ohio as case 2:24-cv-01283, filed 03/20/2024.Related document(s)3 . (R,AP) |
||
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Transfer Case (District) ~Util - Case Termination
Tue 03/19 1:57 PM
Order of Transfer Case (District) - This action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 3/19/2024. (S,SR) |
|
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Tue 03/19 1:59 PM
Copy of3 Transfer Case (District) mailed to Zachary Houston Shomer 748-716 at Richland Correctional Institution P.O. Box 8107 Mansfield, OH 44905 on 3/19/2024. (S,SR) |
||
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/18 8:50 AM
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Zachary Houston Shomer. Related document(s)1 .(R,AP) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Prisoner, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Indigency, | ||
Att: 3 Inmate Demand Statement, | ||
Att: 4 FFF Court Certification, | ||
Att: 5 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/18 8:41 AM
Complaint for violation of civil rights against Amber Marie Rheinscheld, Lt. Williams. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Zachary Houston Shomer. (R,AP) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum Brief, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A - List of all kite grievances, | ||
Att: 4 Inmate Confidential Statement, | ||
Att: 5 11-13-23 Correspondence, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 7 USM-285, | ||
Att: 8 Envelope | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Mon 03/18 8:43 AM
Judge Charles Esque Fleming assigned to case. (R,AP) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/18 8:44 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (R,AP) |