Dellapenta v. Commissioner of Social Security
New York Western District Court | |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00231 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/01 12:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Sertial on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Sertial, Heather) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/20 4:57 PM
TEXT ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court finds that plaintiff meets the statutory requirements for in forma pauperis status and therefore his motion (Dkt. 2) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to file plaintiff's papers without payment of fees. The service of the complaint has been performed in accordance with WDNY Local Rule 5.5. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 3/20/24. (NNR) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/18 10:42 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dennis R Dellapenta.(Comerford, Ida) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/18 10:41 AM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Dennis R Dellapenta.(Comerford, Ida) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Notice of Decision-Unfavorable, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 WITHDRAWAL OF CONSENT OF MAGISTRATE | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/18 10:46 AM
Case placed in Social Security Assignment Pool. (CGJ) |
||
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/18 10:46 AM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (CGJ) |
||
service
Social Security Appeal Notice re Service
Mon 03/18 10:47 AM
NOTICE regarding service of1 Complaint, in a Social Security case: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 5/17/2024. Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk issues this Notice of Electronic Filing to the Regional Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office for the Western District of New York. No summons will issue. (CGJ) |