Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Kezia OL Taylor
Case #: 2:24-cv-00348
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 14, 2024 4:49 AM EDT
Defendant
DANIEL ADIGWE
Represented By
Paul D. Svirbel, I
Litchfield Cavo LLP
contact info
Defendant
JACOB ADIGWE
Represented By
Paul D. Svirbel, I
Litchfield Cavo LLP
contact info
Defendant
EZE SALES & MARKETING INC.
Represented By
Paul D. Svirbel, I
Litchfield Cavo LLP
contact info
Defendant
EBERE GOODLUCK
Represented By
Paul D. Svirbel, I
Litchfield Cavo LLP
contact info
Defendant
PROGRESSIVE LIGHT AND POWER
Represented By
Paul D. Svirbel, I
Litchfield Cavo LLP
contact info
Defendant
PROGRESSIVE LIGHT AND POWER, LLC
Represented By
Paul D. Svirbel, I
Litchfield Cavo LLP
contact info
Defendant
SUNSEA ENERGY HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By
Paul D. Svirbel, I
Litchfield Cavo LLP
contact info
Defendant
SUNSEA ENERGY LLC
Represented By
Paul D. Svirbel, I
Litchfield Cavo LLP
contact info
Defendant
SUNSEA ENERGY NJ, LLC
Represented By
Paul D. Svirbel, I
Litchfield Cavo LLP
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOE 1-100
Defendant
JOHN DOE LLC 1-50
Defendant
XYZ CORPORATION 1-10
TERMINATED PARTIES
Mediator
LINDA A. MICHLER
Terminated: 08/09/2024
2400 Oxford Drive #153
Bethel Park, PA 15102
Represented By
Linda A. Michler
contact info


Docket last updated: 82 minutes ago
Friday, March 21, 2025
85 85 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/21 3:19 PM
ORDER GRANTING the84 Motion for Robert L. Sanzo to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O. L. Taylor on 03/21/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
Related: [-]
84 84 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required) Fri 03/21 9:02 AM
MOTION for attorney Robert L. Sanzo to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-8766620) by DANIEL ADIGWE, JACOB ADIGWE, EZE SALES & MARKETING INC., EBERE GOODLUCK, PROGRESSIVE LIGHT AND POWER, PROGRESSIVE LIGHT AND POWER, LLC, SUNSEA ENERGY HOLDINGS, LLC, SUNSEA ENERGY LLC, SUNSEA ENERGY NJ, LLC. (Sanzo, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
misc QC - Document should have been filed as 2 separate documents Wed 03/19 10:41 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re80 Response to Motion. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised that, in the future, documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Brief in Support, Concise Statement of Material Facts, and Statement of Additional Material Facts. This message is for informational purposes only. (cel)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
83 83 misc Concise Statement of Material Facts Wed 03/19 10:37 AM
STATEMENT OF ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS re80 Response to Motion, by MARIBETH TAYLOR. (cel)
Related: [-]
82 82 misc Concise Statement of Material Facts Wed 03/19 10:35 AM
CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS re80 Response to Motion, by MARIBETH TAYLOR. (cel)
Related: [-]
81 81 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support - Other Wed 03/19 10:34 AM
BRIEF in Support of80 Response to Motion, filed by MARIBETH TAYLOR. (cel)
Related: [-]
80 80 respm Response to Motion Mon 03/17 9:14 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re74 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by MARIBETH TAYLOR. (TAYLOR, MARIBETH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PLAINTIFF'S CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT,
Att: 2 PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DISMISSING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT,
Att: 3 PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS,
Att: 4 Proposed Order PLAINTIFF'S purposed order of the court,
Att: 5 PLAINTIFF APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS TO DENY MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT