Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-54998

Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Sage M Sigler
Case #: 1:24-ap-05054
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Nafisa Bijani
2328 Grady Ridge Dr
Duluth, GA 30097
Represented By
Milton D. Jones
Milton D. Jones, Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Noorani Trading, Inc.
Represented By
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman Klein & Geer, LLC
contact info
Angelo Todd Merolla
Merolla & Gold, LLP
contact info
Caitlyn Powers
Rountree Leitman Klein & Geer, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
misc Hearing Held Wed 03/26 11:51 AM
Hearing Held re: Related [+] (njm)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
16 16 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order (492) Thu 03/20 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Notice Date 03/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
15 15 order 01-Order Mon 03/17 2:17 PM
Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment In Part. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED in that Defendant's discharge is DENIED pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 727(a)(2)-(7); It is further Ordered that Plaintiff's Motion is DENIED as to its requests for attorney's fees under O.C.G.A. § 13-6-11 and punitive damages. Service by BNC. Hearing to be held on 3/26/2025 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 1201, Atlanta. [Review order for virtual hearing information.] Entered on 3/17/2025. Related [+] (mrw)
Related: [-] 9
Sunday, October 13, 2024
14 14 misc 0-Certificate of Service Sun 10/13 8:05 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Milton D. Jones on behalf of Nafisa Bijani. Related [+] (Jones, Milton)
Related: [-] 13
Friday, September 27, 2024
13 13 order Withdraw as Attorney, Motion to Fri 09/27 8:34 AM
Order Permitting Withdrawal Of Attorney, The Motion Is Hereby Granted. Related [+] Service by Debtor's Attorney. Entered on 9/27/2024. (jlc)
Related: [-] 3
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
12 12 misc 0-Certificate of Service Wed 09/04 10:52 PM
Certificate of Service of Motion for Default Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support Filed by Caitlyn Powers on behalf of Noorani Trading, Inc.. Related [+] (Powers, Caitlyn)
Related: [-] 9 ,10
11 11 notice Notice of Deficiency - Adversary Proceeding Wed 09/04 10:39 AM
Notice of deficient filing re: Motion for Default Judgment and Memorandum - Missing Certificate of Service. Service by BNC. Related [+] (yl)
Related: [-] 9 ,10
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
10 10 misc Brief Tue 09/03 3:54 PM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant Nafisa Bijani Filed by Caitlyn Powers on behalf of Noorani Trading, Inc.. Related [+] (Powers, Caitlyn) Modified on 9/4/2024 (yl)
Related: [-] 9
9 9 motion Default Judgment, Motion for Tue 09/03 3:53 PM
Motion for Default Judgment filed by Caitlyn Powers on behalf of Noorani Trading, Inc.. (Powers, Caitlyn)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
misc Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 06/14 3:30 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default, pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7055 and a Request for Entry of Default filed by Noorani Trading, Inc.. It appears from the record that Nafisa Bijani, has failed to plead or otherwise defend in this case as required by law. Related [+] (yl)
Related: [-] 6
Thursday, May 30, 2024
8 8 misc 0-Certificate of Service Thu 05/30 9:15 AM
Certificate of Service of Request for Clerks Entry of Default and Supporting Declaration Filed by Caitlyn Powers on behalf of Noorani Trading, Inc.. Related [+] (Powers, Caitlyn)
Related: [-] 6
Friday, May 24, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Deficiency - Adversary Proceeding Fri 05/24 11:02 AM
Notice of deficient filing re: Request for Entry of Default - Missing Certificate of Service, . Service by BNC. Related [+] (cws)
Related: [-] 6
Thursday, May 23, 2024
6 6 misc Request for Entry of Default Thu 05/23 4:28 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by Caitlyn Powers on behalf of Noorani Trading, Inc.. Related [+] (Powers, Caitlyn)
Related: [-] 1 ,4 ,5
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
5 5 misc Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Wed 04/24 2:26 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint filed by Caitlyn Powers on behalf of Noorani Trading, Inc.. Related [+] (Powers, Caitlyn)
Related: [-] 1 ,4
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
4 4 court Summons/Alias Summons Issued (auto) Wed 04/17 3:03 PM
Alias Summons Issued on Nafisa Bijani Answer Due 05/17/2024 (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
misc Request for Issuance of Alias Summons Tue 04/16 8:16 PM
Request for Issuance of Alias Summons on Nafisa Bijani Filed by Caitlyn Powers on behalf of Noorani Trading, Inc.. (Powers, Caitlyn)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 07, 2024
3 3 motion Withdraw as Attorney, Motion to Sun 04/07 10:19 PM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record filed by Milton D. Jones on behalf of Nafisa Bijani. (Jones, Milton)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
2 2 court Summons/Alias Summons Issued (auto) Mon 03/18 11:59 AM
Summons Issued on Nafisa Bijani Answer Due 04/17/2024 (mrw)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/15 5:43 PM
Adversary case 24-05054 Complaint against Nafisa Bijani , Fee Collected $ 350 68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury) 41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e)) Filed by Noorani Trading, Inc. (Powers, Caitlyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
Att: 8 Exhibit 8
Att: 9 Exhibit 9
Att: 10 Exhibit 10
Att: 11 Exhibit 11
Att: 12 Exhibit 12
Att: 13 Exhibit 13
Att: 14 Exhibit 14
Att: 15 Exhibit 15
Att: 16 Exhibit 16
Att: 17 Exhibit 17
Att: 18 Exhibit 19
Att: 19 Exhibit 19
Att: 20 Exhibit 20
Att: 21 Exhibit 21
Att: 22 Exhibit 22
Att: 23 Exhibit 23
Att: 24 Exhibit 24
Att: 25 Exhibit 25
Att: 26 Exhibit 26
Att: 27 Exhibit 27
Att: 28 Exhibit 28
Att: 29 Exhibit 29
Att: 30 Exhibit 30
Att: 31 Exhibit 31
Att: 32 Exhibit 32
Att: 33 Exhibit 33
Att: 34 Exhibit 34
Att: 35 Exhibit 35
Att: 36 Exhibit 36
Att: 37 Exhibit 37
Att: 38 Exhibit 38
Att: 39 Exhibit 39
Att: 40 Exhibit 40
Att: 41 Exhibit 41
Att: 42 Exhibit 42
Att: 43 Exhibit 43
Att: 44 Exhibit 44
Att: 45 Exhibit 45
Att: 46 Exhibit 46