Florida Northern District Court
Judge:Allen C Winsor
Referred: Martin A Fitzpatrick
Case #: 4:24-cv-00129
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 14, 2024 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant
FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION
Represented By
ANDREW JABUS GROGAN
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
HARI KALLA
Represented By
ANDREW JABUS GROGAN
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
LINDA FIGG
FIGG GROUP, INC. 424 North Calhoun Street
Tallahassee, FL 32301
Represented By
BARRY RICHARD
Barry Richard Law Firm - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
CLINE PRECAST LLC
Represented By
BARRY RICHARD
Barry Richard Law Firm - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
F&M ENGINEERS INC
Represented By
BARRY RICHARD
Barry Richard Law Firm - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
FIGG BRIDGE BUILDERS INC
Represented By
BARRY RICHARD
Barry Richard Law Firm - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
FIGG BRIDGE BUILDERS LLC
Represented By
BARRY RICHARD
Barry Richard Law Firm - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
FIGG BRIDGE DEVELOPERS INC
Represented By
BARRY RICHARD
Barry Richard Law Firm - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
FIGG BRIDGE INSPECTION INC
Represented By
BARRY RICHARD
Barry Richard Law Firm - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
FIGG BRIDGE MANAGERS LLC
Represented By
BARRY RICHARD
Barry Richard Law Firm - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
FIGG ENGINEERING GROUP INC
Represented By
BARRY RICHARD
Barry Richard Law Firm - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
FIGG GROUP INC
Represented By
BARRY RICHARD
Barry Richard Law Firm - Tallahassee Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
37 37 misc Docket Annotation Thu 04/24 7:30 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: 2 flash drives Re36 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Received in TLH clerks office. Stored on back shelf. (sjb)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Summary Judgment Wed 04/23 7:58 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, HARI KALLA. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response to summary judgment not filed earlier: 5/14/2025) . (GROGAN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration with attached Index
Thursday, March 27, 2025
35 35 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/27 1:09 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER entered pursuant to 34 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 3/27/25. Defendants report they will move for summary judgment and will file the administrative record within 30 days of submission of the parties Rule 26(f) report ( 4/23/2025 ). Plaintiffs deadline to respond to the motion and to file their own dispositive motion is 30 days thereafter. Defendants will have 30 days to respond to Plaintiffs dispositive motion. Each side may file a reply within 14 days after the other side responds to a dispositive motion. (tss)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
34 34 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Mon 03/24 1:01 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (GROGAN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
33 33 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 03/17 9:18 AM
ANSWER to32 Amended Complaint by FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, HARI KALLA. (GROGAN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
5 5 Summons Issued as to FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION (tss)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons issued as HARI KALLA
4 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (tss)
Related: [-]
3 3 Summons to Be Issued as to HARI KALLA by LINDA FIGG (RICHARD, BARRY) Modified on 3/18/2024 (tss).
Related: [-]
2 2 Summons to Be Issued as to FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION by LINDA FIGG (RICHARD, BARRY) Modified on 3/18/2024 (tss).
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AFLNDC-8700216.), filed by LINDA FIGG. (RICHARD, BARRY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposal to Debar Linda Figg,
Att: 3 Exhibit Memorandum of Proposal to Debar Based on Affiliation,
Att: 4 Exhibit Linda Figg Declaration