Pike v. Commissioner of Social Security
New York Western District Court | |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-06163 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Thu 03/28 10:21 AM
Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 600000753. (TF) |
||
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/21 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Avni Dinesh Gandhi on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Gandhi, Avni) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/21 10:38 AM
TEXT ORDER denying2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff indicates that he is not employed and does not receive any governmental benefits. His wife supports him with her salary of $6,833.00 per month, which pays for his and their family's expenses. Plaintiff estimates his monthly expenses to be $4,418.00, which consist of mortgage, food, utilities, and other expenses. Based on the Court's review of plaintiff's monthly income and expenses, the Court finds that he has not put forth sufficient indications of indigency, and therefore, plaintiff's motion is denied. Plaintiff has until April 22, 2024, to pay the $405.00 filing fee. If plaintiff does not pay the filing fee or otherwise seek relief from this Order by April 22, 2024, the Clerk of Court will dismiss this case without prejudice without further order. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 3/21/24. (NNR) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/18 11:41 AM
First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Pike.(Gorton, Peter) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/18 11:40 AM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Christopher Pike.(Gorton, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Assignment of Attorneys Fees, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Summons Gen Counsel, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Summons USAG, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Summons USAO | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/18 4:17 PM
Case placed in Social Security Assignment Pool. (TF) |
||
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/18 4:18 PM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (TF) |
||
service
Social Security Appeal Notice re Service
Mon 03/18 4:19 PM
NOTICE regarding service of1 Complaint, in a Social Security case: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 5/17/2024. Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk issues this Notice of Electronic Filing to the Regional Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office for the Western District of New York. No summons will issue. (TF) |