Manuel et al v. Foremost Insurance Co
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | James D Cain, Jr |
Referred: | Thomas P Leblanc |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00389 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 2:11 PM CDT |
Defendant
Foremost Insurance Co
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael Manuel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shelli Manuel
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Mon 04/22 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Craig Ray Hill on behalf of Michael Manuel, Shelli Manuel. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 5/6/2024. (crt,Chavis, J) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Mon 04/22 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Valerie Briggs Bargas on behalf of Foremost Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/6/2024. (crt,Chavis, J) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/22 3:15 PM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Foremost Insurance Co. (aty,Bargas, Valerie) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 04/22 3:05 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, with consent by Foremost Insurance Co. Motions referred to Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/22/2024.(Attorney Valerie Briggs Bargas added to party Foremost Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Bargas, Valerie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/22 10:44 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Manuel, Shelli Manuel. Foremost Insurance Co served on 4/16/24, answer due 5/27/24 . (aty,Hill, Craig) Modified to reflect date of service and answer due date on 4/22/2024 (Whitener, M) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued - All (Form Included)
Mon 03/18 12:09 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Foremost Insurance Co. (crt,Chavis, J) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/18 11:51 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-5887298) filed by Michael Manuel, Shelli Manuel.(Attorney Craig Ray Hill added to party Michael Manuel(pty:pla), Attorney Craig Ray Hill added to party Shelli Manuel(pty:pla))(aty,Hill, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/18 12:08 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. (crt,Chavis, J) |