Jacksonbey v. Carlton
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Steven D Merryday |
Referred: | Philip R Lammens |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00132 |
Nature of Suit | 540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/20 2:33 PM
ORDER ruling deferred 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall file completed Application to Proceed in forma pauperis (prisoner filings) within 21 days from the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank Application to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 3/20/2024. (KLS) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Standing Order - Pro Se Litigants
Mon 03/18 3:21 PM
STANDING ORDER for all incarcerated pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 3/18/2024. (RLK) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/18 3:19 PM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Haneef Shakeel Jacksonbey.(RLK) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
1 | 1
motion
Writ of Mandamus
Mon 03/18 3:17 PM
MOTION for Writ of Mandamus by Haneef Shakeel Jacksonbey.(RLK) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope |