Palacio v. MAYORKAS et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | John Antoon II |
Referred: | Daniel C Irick |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00527 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 05:0702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 5:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Director Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Camp Springs, MD 20588
|
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Washington, DC 20528
|
|
Plaintiff
Teresita Palacio
David Stoller, PA 4445 Conway Rd.
Orlando, FL 32812 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Saturday, March 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Sat 03/30 2:11 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re4 Interested Persons Order by Teresita Palacio. (Stoller, David) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Sat 03/30 2:10 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Teresita Palacio. Related case(s): Yes (Stoller, David) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Sat 03/30 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by David Stoller on behalf of Teresita Palacio. Lead Counsel: David Stoller. (Stoller, David) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Interested Persons Order
Tue 03/26 1:49 PM
INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Counsel have 7 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 3/26/2024. (KLD) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons issued
Tue 03/19 3:51 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. (KME) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/18 3:51 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:24-cv-527-JA-DCI. (RLK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/18 2:07 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21881487) filed by Teresita Palacio.(Stoller, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Form I-765 Denial Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Information Relating to Closure of Local ERO Offices, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, Mayorkas, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, Jaddou |