Witt v. Future Motion, Inc.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Anne C Conway |
Referred: | Leslie Hoffman Price |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00528 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Orange County Court, 2023-CA-004806-O |
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 5:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Future Motion, Inc.
Rumberger Kirk & Caldwell 80 SW 8th Street Suite 3000
Miami, FL 33130 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leonard Witt
Morgan & Morgan, P.A. 20 North Orange Avenue Suite 1600
Orlando, FL 32801 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
utility
Acknowledgment - Transferred Case Opened
Mon 04/22 11:06 AM
Acknowledgment - Transferred case has been opened in the Northern District of California as case 5:24-cv-2362, filed on 4/19/2024. (RN) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Multidistrict Litigation Out
Fri 04/19 10:28 AM
MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of California - MDL case number: 3087. (RPB) |
|
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/19 10:26 AM
Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order Transferring This Matter to the US District Court for the Northern District of California.(RPB) |
|
Att: 1 Order Lifting Stay | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
8
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
Thu 04/11 1:32 PM
ORDER Denying 4 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court. The Clerk is Directed to send a copy to the Multi District Panel staff via email at PanelMDL@jpml.uscourts.gov for MDL No. 3087. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 4/10/2024. (KLD) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Tue 04/09 2:49 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Future Motion, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Holt, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/09 2:48 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re6 Interested Persons Order by Future Motion, Inc.. (Holt, Michael) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 04/01 7:00 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re4 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Future Motion, Inc.. (Holt, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Interested Persons Order
Tue 03/26 2:04 PM
INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Parties have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 3/26/2024. (KLD) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/22 3:05 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 2 Case Assigned/Reassigned by Leonard Witt. (Goldrosen, Eitan) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Remand to State Court
Mon 03/18 5:16 PM
First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Leonard Witt. (Goldrosen, Eitan) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Mon 03/18 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Michael R. Holt on behalf of Future Motion, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Michael R. Holt. (Holt, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/18 3:45 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:24-cv-528-ACC-LHP. (ARL) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/18 2:21 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Complaint, case number 2023-CA-004806-O filed in State Court on 03/20/2023. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21881606 filed by Future Motion, Inc..(Holt, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 State Court ANSWER Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Declaration of Michael R. Holt, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E - PL's Unverified Responses to 1st Interrogatories, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F - PL's Obj and Responses to 1st Request for Production, | ||
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet |