GOODWIN v. United Airlines, Inc.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | John Antoon II |
Referred: | Robert M Norway |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00530 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Ninth Judicial Circuit Court for Orange County, 2023-CA-017453-O |
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 5:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
United Airlines, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
JENNIFER GOODWIN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/23 4:45 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff shall file a Disclosure Statement no later than April 29, 2024. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 4/23/2024. (EK) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Case Management Report
Mon 04/22 3:06 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Pantelopoulos, Nicholas) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of appearance
Mon 04/22 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Hipple on behalf of United Airlines, Inc. (Hipple, Lauren) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
misc
Disbursement Voucher / Refund
Fri 04/12 2:00 PM
REFUND for duplicate payment. Receipt number AFLMDC-21969846 refunded in the amount of $ $405.00 paid to John Schuchert.. (NLC) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/10 7:51 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ninth Judicial Circuit Court in and for Orange County, Florida, case number 2023-CA-017453-O filed in State Court on 12/11/2023. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21969846 filed by United Airlines, Inc..(Pantelopoulos, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Service of Process, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Original Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Demand Letter_Redacted | ||
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/02 12:01 PM
ORDER re 1 Notice of Removal. No later than April 10, 2024, Defendant shall file an amended notice of removal establishing that the parties were of diverse citizenship at the time of removal. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 4/2/2024. (EK) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/27 3:27 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by United Airlines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Airlines Holdings, Inc. for United Airlines, Inc... (Pantelopoulos, Nicholas) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Tue 03/26 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Nicholas E. Pantelopoulos on behalf of United Airlines, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Nicholas E. Pantelopoulos. (Pantelopoulos, Nicholas) |
|
5 | 5
order
Interested Persons Order
Tue 03/26 2:26 PM
INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Counsel have 7 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 3/26/2024. (KLD) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Tue 03/26 1:12 PM
NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 03/25 9:03 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by United Airlines, Inc..(Pantelopoulos, Nicholas) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/19 3:22 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:24-cv-530-JA-RMN. (TNP) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/18 4:49 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ninth Judicial Circuit Court in and for Orange County, Florida, case number 2023-CA-017453-O filed in State Court on 12/11/2023. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21882905 filed by JENNIFER GOODWIN.(Pantelopoulos, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Summons and Service of Process, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Demand Letter, | ||
Att: 4 State Court COMPLAINT, | ||
Att: 5 State Court Other Documents State Court Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 State Court Other Documents Judicial Disclosure, | ||
Att: 7 State Court Other Documents Notice of Designation of Email Address, | ||
Att: 8 State Court Other Documents Notice of Filing, | ||
Att: 9 State Court Other Documents Notice of Service of Interrogatories, | ||
Att: 10 State Court Other Documents Request to Produce, | ||
Att: 11 State Court Other Documents Return of Service, | ||
Att: 12 State Court Other Documents Standing Case Management Plan, | ||
Att: 13 State Court Other Documents Summons, | ||
Att: 14 Civil Cover Sheet |