New Jersey District Court
Judge:Esther Salas
Referred: Jose R Almonte
Case #: 2:24-cv-03791
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2024
Terminated:Mar 13, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Sep 14, 2024 5:13 AM EDT
Defendant
BANG ME BAKERY LLC
Defendant
GEORGE KUAN
Plaintiff
DARNY FLORES
Represented By
ANDREW GLENN
Jaffe Glenn Law Group, P.A.
contact info
JODI J. JAFFE
Jaffe Glenn Law Group, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
YANET FLOR ABAD LOPEZ


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 05/05 12:27 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: 60-Day Order Administrative Termination deadline reset for 6/6/2025. (ek)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
29 29 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/29 4:08 PM
LETTER ORDER that the 60-day order deadline is extended until 6/6/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 4/29/2025. (sm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
28 28 misc Letter Mon 04/28 3:06 PM
Letter from Andrew I Glenn. (GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
27 27 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Thu 03/13 1:51 PM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 5/12/2025. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 3/13/2025. (sm)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Text Order Thu 03/13 1:13 PM
TEXT ORDER: In light of the parties' representation that this matter has settled (ECF No.25 ), the status conference scheduled for April 2, 2025, is adjourned. The Court will enter a 60-day order pending consummation of settlement. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 3/13/2025. (akw, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
25 25 misc Letter Wed 03/12 12:54 PM
Letter from Andrew I Glenn. (GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order Thu 02/27 3:21 PM
LETTER ORDER granting the parties' request that the deadline to raise discovery disputes is extended for two weeks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 2/26/2025. (sm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
23 23 misc Letter Tue 02/25 10:47 AM
Letter from Andrew I Glenn. (GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
22 22 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Sun 02/02 7:28 PM
TEXT ORDER: In light of the status of discovery outlined in the parties' joint status letter (ECF No.21 ), the status conference scheduled on February 6, 2025, is adjourned to April 2, 2025, at 2:30 p.m. For the conference, please dial 973-437-5535 and enter Phone conference ID: 200 253 83#. No later than March 26, 2025, the parties shall file a joint letter not to exceed five (5) pages summarizing the status of the case. To the extent the parties wish to raise a discovery dispute, they shall do so consistent with the Court's[LINK:Case Management Order] . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 1/31/2025. (akw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
21 21 misc Letter Thu 01/30 4:28 PM
Letter from Andrew I Glenn. (GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
20 20 order Scheduling Order Wed 12/11 10:25 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 12/10/2024. (sm)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 12/10 3:50 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will enter a pretrial scheduling order setting forth discovery deadlines. A status conference is scheduled for February 6, 2025, at 3:00 p.m. For the conference, please dial 973-437-5535 and enter Phone conference ID: 200 253 83#. No later than January 30, 2025, the parties shall file a joint letter not to exceed five (5) pages summarizing the status of the case. To the extent the parties wish to raise a discovery dispute, they shall do so consistent with the Court's[LINK:Case Management Order] . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 12/10/2024. (akw, )
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 12/10 3:45 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. An initial scheduling conference was held on December 10, 2024. The Court discussed the possibility of early resolution and instructed the party to focus on discovery that will facilitate settlement. The Court will enter a pretrial scheduling order setting forth discovery deadlines. (akw, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
18 18 misc Letter Mon 12/02 6:12 PM
Letter from Andrew I Glenn. (GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 12/02 5:52 PM
TEXT ORDER: By December 6, 2024, Plaintiff's counsel shall file a letter informing the Court the reason for their failure to appear at the initial scheduling conference. The conference is rescheduled to December 10, 2024, at 3:00 p.m. For the conference, please dial 973-437-5535 and enter Phone conference ID: 930 626 810#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 12/2/2024. (akw)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Mon 12/02 5:05 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. An initial scheduling conference was held on December 2, 2024. Plaintiff's counsel failed to appear for the conference. The Court will adjourn the conference to a new date. (akw, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
16 16 discov Joint Discovery Plan Mon 11/25 3:44 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by DARNY FLORES, YANET FLOR ABAD LOPEZ.(GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Mon 10/28 7:46 PM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ek)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
15 15 3 pgs order Order Tue 10/22 3:07 PM
LETTER ORDER PURSUANT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 16.1 that on 12/2/2024 at 2:00 p.m. you shall participate in an initial scheduling conference; at least 14 days prior to the conference scheduled, counsel shall personally meet and confer pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and shall jointly submit a discovery plan to the undersigned not later than five (5) business days prior to the conference with the Court; the parties shall submit a Joint Discovery Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 10/21/2024. (sm)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/23 4:02 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(SALVATORIELLO, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Vacate Fri 09/20 10:04 AM
STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER VACATING CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT granting11 Motion to Vacate that the Clerk's entry of default dated June 13, 2024 is vacated; (2) Defendants' Motion to Vacate, dated September 17, 2024, is withdrawn, obviating the need for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants' Motion, as the parties herein file this Stipulation and Consent Order; and (3) Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Jury Demand is extended to and including October 1, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 9/19/2024. (sm)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Fri 09/20 10:14 AM
Answer Due Deadline Update - The document submitted by GEORGE KUAN, BANG ME BAKERY LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/1/2024. (sm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
12 12 misc Stipulation Wed 09/18 4:31 PM
STIPULATION to Vacate Default and extend time to file Answer by YANET FLOR ABAD LOPEZ, DARNY FLORES. (GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
11 11 motion Vacate Tue 09/17 4:58 PM
MOTION to Vacate by All Defendants.(SALVATORIELLO, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Motion to Vacate,
Att: 2 Memorandum Memo of Law in Support of Motion to Vacate,
Att: 3 Certification Certification of Paul Salvatoriello, Esq. with Exhibit A in Support of Motion to Vacate,
Att: 4 Certification Certification of George Kuan,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service Certification of Service Motion to Vacate
Friday, September 06, 2024
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/06 10:51 AM
NOTICE by YANET FLOR ABAD LOPEZ, DARNY FLORES of Filing Corrected Consent to Joins(GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Corrected Consent to Join,
Att: 2 Exhibit Corrected Consent to Join
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/06 9:09 AM
NOTICE by YANET FLOR ABAD LOPEZ, DARNY FLORES of Striking (GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/06 8:48 AM
NOTICE by YANET FLOR ABAD LOPEZ, DARNY FLORES(GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Corrected Consent to Join,
Att: 2 Exhibit Corrected Consent to Join
Friday, August 23, 2024
7 7 order Text Order Mon 08/26 5:59 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Consent to Join at ECF No. 6 ("The Notice"). The Notice attaches "Consent to Join" forms signed by Darny Flores (ECF No. 6-1), Plaintiff in this matter, and Yanet Flor Abad Lopez (ECF No. 6-2). As a preliminary matter, the documents at ECF No. 6-1 and 6-2 seem to be incomplete, as they do not name an entity that the individuals seek to sue. ("I hereby consent to become a party plaintiff and make a claim against [BLANK] and related entities or persons for unpaid wages."). As it relates to collective actions under the Fair Labor Standards Act, 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) states, "[n]o employee shall be a party plaintiff to any such action unless he gives his consent in writing to become such a party and such consent is filed in the court in which such action is brought." While the forms suggest that Darny Flores and Yanet Flor Abad Lopez consent to join the case as Plaintiffs, the form they signed does not contain the Defendants' names, and therefore, leaves doubt as to whether they are aware who this case is brought against. By September 6, 2024, Plaintiff shall refile the notice with signed "Consent to Join" forms containing the Defendants' names.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 8/23/2024. (akw, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Wed 07/10 10:31 AM
NOTICE by DARNY FLORES, YANET FLOR ABAD LOPEZ of Filing Consent to Join(JAFFE, JODI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement,
Att: 2 Supplement
Friday, June 14, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order Fri 06/14 12:34 PM
LETTER ORDER that, if moving for default judgment, the Court orders Plaintiff to submit a brief (no more than 7 single-spaced pages) with any materials in support of the default-judgment motion--which specifically addresses each of the above factors in an organized, easy-to-read format using headings (and, if necessary, sub-headings) and numbered paragraphs or bullet points; the brief may omit a table of contents and table of authorities; to be sure, any such motion for default judgment must still be filed as a motion and comport with the requirements of this District's Local Civil Rule 7.1 (e.g., Notice of Motion)--except for Rule 7.1(d)(4) and Rule 7.1(g). Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 6/14/2024. (sm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
order Clerks Entry of Default Thu 06/13 9:45 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Bang Me Bakery, LLC, and George Kuan for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (sm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
4 4 motion Entry of Default Wed 06/12 10:15 PM
First MOTION for Entry of Default by DARNY FLORES.(JAFFE, JODI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 06/12 9:56 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DARNY FLORES. BANG ME BAKERY LLC served on 4/5/2024, answer due 4/26/2024; GEORGE KUAN served on 4/5/2024, answer due 4/26/2024.(JAFFE, JODI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Affidavit
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 03/19 9:54 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BANG ME BAKERY LLC, GEORGE KUAN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/18 4:38 PM
COMPLAINT against BANG ME BAKERY LLC, GEORGE KUAN ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15189483) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DARNY FLORES.(GLENN, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 03/19 9:33 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. (ak, )
Related: [-]