Ballantyne v. Guenther Management LLC et al
Washington Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas O Rice |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00085 |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Cause | 42:405 Fair Housing Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 2:23 PM PDT |
Defendant
Erich Guenter
|
|
Defendant
Mischa Guenter
|
|
Defendant
Hubertus Guenther
|
|
Defendant
Guenther Management LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sergey Kholostov
|
|
Defendant
Victor M
|
|
Plaintiff
Nathaniel Manny Ballantyne
6805 N Belt Street
Spokane, WA 99208 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Pro Se Notice Re Electronic Service
Thu 04/25 3:53 PM
Pro se litigant Nathaniel Manny Ballantyne has registered to file documents electronically and receive service of documents and notice of electronic filings at email address mballantyne@morrislegalfla.com. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL ISSUE. (AY, DQA) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Obtain Electronic Case Filing Authorization
Thu 04/18 11:58 AM
ORDER GRANTING3 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO OBTAIN ECF LOGIN AND PASSWORD. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (WMK, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/15 12:49 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Guenther Management LLC.(Versnel, John) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/02 9:06 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Cornelius Versnel, III on behalf of Erich Guenter, Mischa Guenter, Hubertus Guenther, Guenther Management LLC, Sergey Kholostov (Attorney John Cornelius Versnel, III added to party Erich Guenter(pty:dft), Attorney John Cornelius Versnel, III added to party Mischa Guenter(pty:dft), Attorney John Cornelius Versnel, III added to party Hubertus Guenther(pty:dft), Attorney John Cornelius Versnel, III added to party Guenther Management LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Cornelius Versnel, III added to party Sergey Kholostov(pty:dft))(Versnel, John) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Proof of Service
Thu 03/28 4:35 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by Nathaniel Manny Ballantyne re Victor M. (BM, Case Administrator) |
|
4 | 4
service
Proof of Service
Thu 03/28 4:33 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by Nathaniel Manny Ballantyne re Guenther Management LLC. (BM, Case Administrator) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Obtain Electronic Case Filing Authorization (Pro Se Filer Only)
Mon 03/18 1:48 PM
MOTION to Obtain Electronic Case Filing Authorization by Nathaniel Manny Ballantyne. Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2024 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (WMK, Case Administrator) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/18 1:45 PM
Summons Issued in paper as to All Defendants. (WMK, Case Administrator) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/18 1:44 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing Fee $405, Receipt # 42374) Jury Demand. Filed by Nathaniel Manny Ballantyne.(WMK, Case Administrator) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |