Marjalinat, Inc
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Martin R Barash |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-10433 |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
MARJALINAT, INC., Debtor in Possession
13400 Saticoy St Ste 5
N Hollywood, CA 91605-7604 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 30 minutes ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Fri 04/26 9:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/26/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Wed 04/24 9:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/24/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Proof of service
Tue 04/23 7:31 AM
Proof of service Of Order Granting Application of Marjalinat, Inc., Dba House of Salaminos to Allow Counsel to Appear via Zoom or to Continue Hearings to the First Date Available after Apri.l 30, 2024, Declaration in Support Thereof (Application) Filed by Debtor Marjalinat, Inc . (Brownstein, William) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
order
X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF)
Mon 04/22 1:52 PM
Order Granting Application of Marjalinat, Inc. to Allow Counsel to Appear Via Zoom; or to Continue Hearings to the First Date Available After April 30, 2024 (BNC-PDF) Signed on 4/22/2024 (JC) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Declaration
Mon 04/22 7:31 AM
Declaration re: Filed by Debtor Marjalinat, Inc . (Brownstein, William) |
|
court
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Mon 04/22 1:54 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Hearing to be held on 05/02/2024 at 02:00 PM 21041 Burbank Blvd Woodland Hills, CA 91367 for18 , (JC) |
||
court
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Mon 04/22 1:55 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Hearing to be held on 05/02/2024 at 02:00 PM 21041 Burbank Blvd Woodland Hills, CA 91367 for1 , (JC) |
||
Sunday, April 21, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Errata
Sun 04/21 9:42 AM
Errata Addendum to Debtors Case Management Statement Pursuant to Order Setting Scheduling and Case Management Conference and Notice of Corrected Time for Hearing Filed by Debtor Marjalinat, Inc . (Brownstein, William) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Fri 04/19 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/19/2024. (Admin.) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Notice of Deficiency of Filing Fees Required to Add Additional Creditors (BNC)
Fri 04/19 1:30 PM
Notice of Deficiency of Filing Fees Required to Add Additional Creditors (BNC) (TK) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Addendum to Vol Pet
Fri 04/19 12:28 PM
Addendum to voluntary petition , Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) , Amended Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) , Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) Filed by Debtor Marjalinat, Inc. (Brownstein, William) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Continue Hearing/Rescheduled Hearing (BK/AP Case) (motion)
Fri 04/19 11:50 AM
Motion to Continue Hearing On Filed by Debtor Marjalinat, Inc (Brownstein, William) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Proof of service
Thu 04/18 7:44 PM
Proof of service Filed by Debtor Marjalinat, Inc . (Brownstein, William) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
court
Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Wed 04/17 5:26 PM
Hearing Set The Hearing date is set for 4/30/2024 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 303, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. The case judge is Martin R. Barash (JC) |
|
21 | 21
order
Shortening time (BNC-PDF)
Wed 04/17 5:25 PM
Order Granting Application and Setting Hearing on Shortened Notice (BNC-PDF) Signed on 4/17/2024 (JC) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Motion For Order Without a Hearing (LBR 9013-1(p) or (q))
Wed 04/17 3:30 PM
Notice of Motion For Order Without a Hearing (LBR 9013-1(p) or (q)) Notice of Setting/Increasing Insider Copmensation Filed by Debtor Marjalinat, Inc. (Brownstein, William) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Ex parte application (motion)
Wed 04/17 2:14 PM
Ex parte application for an Order Shortening Time for Notice of Hearing Filed by Debtor Marjalinat, Inc (Brownstein, William) |
|
18 | 18
22
pgs
motion
Use Cash Collateral (motion)
Wed 04/17 1:49 PM
Motion to Use Cash Collateral Notice of Motion and Motion in Chapter 11 Case for Order Approving Budget and Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral [11 U.s.c. § 363]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration(s) in Support Thereof and Exhibit(s) Filed by Debtor Marjalinat, Inc (Brownstein, William) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Status Report for Chapter 11 Status Conference
Tue 04/16 3:56 PM
Status Report for Chapter 11 Status Conference Debtors Case Management Statement Pursuant to Order Setting Scheduling and Case Management Conference Filed by Debtor Marjalinat, Inc . (Brownstein, William) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
28
pgs
motion
Employ (motion)
Wed 04/10 2:56 PM
Application to Employ William H. Brownstein & Associates, Professional Corporation as Bankruptcy Attorneys Notice of Application and Application by Chapter 11 Debtor-in-Possession for Authorization to Employ William H. Brownstein & Associates, Professional Corporation as General Bankruptcy Counsel Effective March 18, 2024; Statement of Disinterestedness in Support Thereof and Exhibit(s) [11 U.S.C. §§327(a) Fed. R. Bank. P. 2014; Loc. Bankr. R. 2014-1(b)] Filed by Debtor Marjalinat, Inc (Brownstein, William) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR F1007-1)
Mon 03/25 9:23 AM
Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) Filed by Debtor Marjalinat, Inc. (Brownstein, William) |
|
Sunday, March 24, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Balance Sheet
Sun 03/24 10:53 AM
Balance Sheet, Statement of Operations for Small Business, Cash Flow Statement for Small Business, Tax Documents for the Year for 2022 Filed by Debtor Marjalinat, Inc. (Brownstein, William) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Fri 03/22 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 03/22/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Thu 03/21 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/21/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Wed 03/20 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/20/2024. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Wed 03/20 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/20/2024. (Admin.) |
|
9 | 9
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships under Subchapter V) (309F2)
Wed 03/20 1:11 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/18/2024 at 10:00 AM at UST-SVND2, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-820-9498, PARTICIPANT CODE:6468388. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 6/17/2024. Proofs of Claims due by 5/28/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 9/16/2024. (AG1) |
|
8 | 8
trustee
Notice Appointing Trustee
Wed 03/20 11:51 AM
Notice of Appointment of Trustee and Acceptance of Sub Chapter V Trustee . Moriah Douglas Flahaut (TR) added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SV). (Escobar, Eryk) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Tue 03/19 9:43 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Corporate parents added to case: Marjalinat, Inc.. Filed by Debtor MARJALINAT, INC. . (Brownstein, William) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Corp Resolution Auth Filing
Tue 03/19 9:29 AM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor MARJALINAT, INC. . (Brownstein, William) |
|
5 | 5
court
Hearing Set (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Tue 03/19 8:12 AM
Hearing Set - scheduling and case management conference The Hearing date is set for 4/30/2024 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 303, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. The case judge is Martin R. Barash (JC) |
|
4 | 4
8
pgs
order
Order setting initial status conference in chapter 11 case (BNC-PDF)
Tue 03/19 8:10 AM
Order setting initial status conference in chapter 11 case (BNC-PDF) Signed on 3/19/2024 . Status hearing to be held on 4/30/2024 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 303, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. The case judge is Martin R. Barash (JC) Modified on 3/19/2024 (JC) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
court
Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (VAN-197)
Mon 03/18 4:30 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (BNC) . (RT) |
|
2 | 2
court
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required
Mon 03/18 4:27 PM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect schedules /statements recorded as deficient. THE PROPER DEFICIENCY HAS BEEN ISSUED. (RT) |
|
1 | 1
49
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 03/18 3:29 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by MARJALINAT, INC. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 04/1/2024. Statement About Your Social Security Numbers (Form 121) due by 04/1/2024. Cert. of Credit Counseling due by 04/1/2024. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 04/1/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 04/1/2024. Disclosure of Compensation of Bankruptcy Petition Preparer (Form 2800) due 04/1/2024. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 04/1/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 04/1/2024. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 06/17/2024. (Brownstein, William) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 03/18 3:32 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:1:24-bk-10433] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56625892. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |