Brannan v. Smith et al
Utah District Court | |
Judge: | Dale A Kimball |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00205 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Financial Certificate
Wed 04/17 2:48 PM
**SEALED DOCUMENT** FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Jim C Brannan received from Correctional Institution. Initial Partial Filing Fee $ 8.80.(kpf) |
|
Att: 1 Resident Transaction Details | ||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appoint Counsel
Wed 04/17 9:51 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Originally received by the court on 03/18/2024) filed by Plaintiff Jim C Brannan. (sg) |
|
6 | 6
cmp
Complaint (Court)
Wed 04/17 9:50 AM
COMPLAINT against Logan Clark, FNU Farrer, Jake Hall, Mark LNU, FNU Lisonbee, FNU Reynolds, Zachary Robinson, FNU Sainsbury, Mike Smith, FNU Wankier (Originally received by the court on 03/18/2024). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Jim C Brannan. Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (sg) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/15 3:08 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 1 granting Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepaying the Filing Fee. Based on the inmate's attached Required Authorization, Consent, and Declaration, the inmate account office is authorized and requested to: 1) within 14 days file the Financial Certificate showing the Initial Partial Filing Fee together with the inmate account statement as outlined in the attached instructions, and 2) remit the initial partial filing fee within 30 days as outlined in the attached instructions. Failure to comply will result in case dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 04/15/2024. No attached document. (kpf) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Declaration
Tue 04/16 12:51 PM
DECLARATION for Entry of Default of Jim C. Brannan filed by Jim C Brannan.(kpf) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope 1 | ||
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
utility
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Tue 03/19 1:40 PM
*** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Jim C Brannan received from Correctional Institution(sg) |
|
Att: 1 Correspondence letter from Jim C Brannan, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
2 | 2
utility
Lodged Document
Tue 03/19 1:33 PM
DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Complaint, Motion to appoint counsel, Civil Cover Sheet, Envelope. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court.(sg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Motion to Appoint Counsel, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/19 1:31 PM
**SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to PLU. filed by Plaintiff Jim C Brannan. (sg) |