Buckman v. Buckman et al
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Micah WJ Smith |
Referred: | Kenneth J Mansfield |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00129 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | First Circuit Court, State of Hawaii, 1CCV-24-0000095 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 2:06 PM HST |
Defendant
Jennifer Buckman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark F. Buckman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Doe Corporations 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Doe Governmental Agencies 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Doe Partnerships 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Jane Does 1-10
|
|
Defendant
John Does 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Mark F. Buckman Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia W. Buckman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia W. Buckman Revocable Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM HST |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Reply
Wed 04/24 11:57 PM
REPLY re9 First MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim filed by Mark F. Buckman. (Buckman, Mark) |
|
21 | 21
respm
Reply
Wed 04/24 10:45 PM
REPLY re8 First MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim filed by Jennifer Buckman. (Buckman, Mark) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
minutes
Link 1 - Terminate Hearings 2 - Set Hearings
Mon 04/22 6:50 AM
EO: In light of the pending Motions9 and8 MOTIONS to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 04/22/2024 IS CONTINUED TO 06/24/2024 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 06/17/2024. Parties are to participate via telephone through the Courts Zoom Teleconference . Call-in information for this hearing is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864 Access Code: 160 8983 1896 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Scheduling Conference Statement
Mon 04/15 10:02 PM
Scheduling Conference Statement . (Buckman, Mark) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Initial Disclosure
Mon 04/15 10:00 PM
INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Mark F. Buckman. (Buckman, Mark) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Initial Disclosure
Mon 04/15 3:29 PM
INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Patricia W. Buckman.(Wilson, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
18
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Wed 04/10 2:24 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re9 First MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim ,8 First MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim filed by Patricia W. Buckman.(Wilson, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Scheduling Conference Statement
Thu 04/04 2:50 PM
Scheduling Conference Statement of the Plaintiffs .(Wilson, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
14 | 14
misc
Report of Planning Meeting
Thu 04/04 11:10 AM
REPORT of Planning Meeting submitted by the Plaintiffs .(Wilson, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Thu 04/04 11:00 AM
Plaintiffs' ANSWER to11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Patricia W. Buckman.(Wilson, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Consent Election Form
Thu 03/28 9:48 AM
Consent Election Form (Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge) Modified on 3/28/2024 (eta) |
|
misc
Advisory Entry
Thu 03/28 2:14 PM
ADVISORY ENTRY . The entry docket number12 Consent Election Form Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge (AO 85), was filed incorrectly in this case. If the parties wish to proceed before a magistrate judge, the "Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge", must be signed by ALL parties. Once completed, the form may be submitted to Judge Micah W. J. Smith for approval at smith_orders@hid.uscourts.gov. (eta) |
||
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Wed 03/27 5:24 PM
Mark F. Buckman's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Mark F. Buckman's , First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Mark F. Buckman.(Buckman, Mark) |
|
10 | 10
minutes
Link
Wed 03/27 9:52 AM
EO: The Court sets the following briefing schedule for Defendant Jennifer Buckman's8 Motion to Dismiss, filed March 25, 2024, and Defendant Mark F. Buckman's9 Motion to Dismiss, filed March 25, 2024: Oppositions shall be due April 10, 2024. Any replies shall be due April 24, 2024. After receipt of the parties' briefs, the Court will notify the parties if a hearing is deemed necessary. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE MICAH W.J. SMITH) (rls) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 03/25 11:57 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim Mark Frank Buckman appearing for Defendant Mark F. Buckman (Buckman, Mark) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 03/25 10:33 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim Mark Frank Buckman appearing for Defendant Jennifer Buckman (Buckman, Mark) |
|
7 | 7
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 03/25 10:30 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jennifer Buckman Certificate of Service (Notice to Adverse Party of Removal Along with State Court NEF dated 3 18-2024 (Buckman, Mark) |
|
6 | 6
minutes
1 - Terminate Hearings 2 - Set Hearings
Mon 03/25 4:21 PM
EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference TIME IS CONTINUED FROM 9:30 a.m. TO 10:30 a.m. on the same date of 04/22/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD by telephone. Scheduling conference statements are due by 04/15/2024. Parties are to participate via telephone through the Courts Zoom Teleconference . Call-in information for this hearing is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864 Access Code: 160 8983 1896 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Rule 16
Mon 03/18 1:49 PM
Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 4/22/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 3/18/2024. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Mon 03/18 1:43 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00129 MWJS-KJM on all further pleadings . (eta) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 03/18 12:58 PM
CIVIL Cover Sheet by Jennifer Buckman. (Buckman, Mark) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/18 12:56 PM
NOTICE by Jennifer Buckman re1 Notice of Removal, Mark F. Buckman's Notice of Joinder in Removal Jennifer Buckman. (Buckman, Mark) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/18 12:39 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jennifer Buckman ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AHIDC-2976275), filed by Jennifer Buckman.(Buckman, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - State Court Summons |