Dang v. Department of Children and Families et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Julie S Sneed |
Referred: | Leslie Hoffman Price |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00525 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 19, 2024 12:44 AM EDT |
Defendant
Department of Children and Families
|
|
Defendant
Shevaun Harris
|
|
Plaintiff
Mailin Thi Dang
385 Piney Ridge Road
Casselberry, FL 32707 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendations Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/25 10:48 AM
ORDER adopting 3 Report and Recommendations; denying 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on April 25, 2024. (PNT) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order to show cause
Fri 04/19 1:52 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Mailin Thi Dang. Plaintiff has failed to comply with the Court's Order 4 . Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE and file a response to said Order within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of the case without further notice or other appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 4/19/2024. (GNB) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
13
pgs
order
Order
Fri 03/29 1:57 PM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by District Judge Julie S. Sneed on 3/29/2024. (GNB) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Report and Recommendations
Mon 03/25 4:26 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. For the reasons stated herein, it is respectfully RECOMMENDED that the Court: 1. DENY without prejudice the motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. No. 2); 2. DISMISS the complaint without prejudice (Doc. No. 1); 3. PERMIT Plaintiff to file an amended complaint, within a time established by the Court, along with a renewed motion to proceed in forma pauperis, by filing an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form). Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 3/25/2024. (MKH) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/18 12:11 PM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Mailin Thi Dang. (e-portal) (ARL) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/18 12:08 PM
COMPLAINT against Department of Children and Families, Shevaun Harris with Jury Demand filed by Mailin Thi Dang. (e-portal)(ARL) |