District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Reggie B Walton
Case #: 1:24-cv-00788
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2024
Terminated:Sep 06, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 15, 2024 4:59 AM EDT
Defendant
ANTONY BLINKEN
Represented By
Ernesto Horacio Molina, Jr.
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Vaughn DE LA Vega Spencer
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
Y ROBERT EWING
Represented By
Ernesto Horacio Molina, Jr.
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Vaughn DE LA Vega Spencer
Doj-Civ
contact info
Plaintiff
HUSSEIN ALI AHMED AL FADHL
Represented By
Joshua L. Goldstein
Goldstein Immigration Lawyers
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
order .Order Tue 09/03 11:25 AM
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the plaintiff's9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 3, 2024. (lcrbw3)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 08/30 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by HUSSEIN ALI AHMED AL FADHL (Goldstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 07/17 1:13 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ANTONY BLINKEN, Y ROBERT EWING. (Spencer, Vaughn)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 07/17 4:54 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendants'8 Joint Motion for Extension of Time, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that, on or before October 17, 2024, the defendants shall file their answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 17, 2024. (lcrbw3)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 05/20 3:11 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ANTONY BLINKEN, Y ROBERT EWING. (Spencer, Vaughn)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/20 3:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Vaughn DE LA Vega Spencer on behalf of All Defendants (Spencer, Vaughn)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 05/20 4:31 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendants'7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that, on or before July 19, 2024, the defendants shall file their answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 20, 2024. (lcrbw3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/25 5:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ernesto Horacio Molina, Jr on behalf of ANTONY BLINKEN, Y ROBERT EWING (Molina, Ernesto)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
4 4 order .Order Tue 04/02 11:49 AM
GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 2, 2024. (lcrbw3)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Tue 04/02 7:53 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/22/2024. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/21/2024.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANTONY BLINKEN served on 4/1/2024; Y ROBERT EWING served on 4/1/2024, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/01/2024. (Goldstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Thu 03/21 9:18 AM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/21 9:13 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (mg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Mandamus Tue 03/19 7:47 AM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS AND COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against ANTONY BLINKEN, Y ROBERT EWING ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10763871) filed by HUSSEIN ALI AHMED AL FADHL.(Goldstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons