McClintock v. Pollawit
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Katherine A Robertson |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-30039 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 19, 2024 9:05 AM EDT |
Defendant
Poomjai Pollawit
Mass State Police Sgt Thomas Dion Way
Westfield, MA 01085 |
|
Plaintiff
Robert McClintock
54 Stimson Street
Palmer, MA 01069 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 04/25 2:06 PM
Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to June 11, 2024 to Respond to Complaint. (Zamorski, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 04/17 7:39 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 11, 2024 to Respond to Complaint by Poomjai Pollawit.(Keeley, Elizabeth) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 7:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth K. Keeley on behalf of Poomjai Pollawit (Keeley, Elizabeth) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 04/15 9:01 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Robert McClintock. All Plaintiffs. Acknowledgement filed by Robert McClintock. (Delle, Robert) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/22 5:03 PM
Summons Issued as to Poomjai Pollawit. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Figueroa, Tamara) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/22 10:02 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded [LINK:here] . These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Horvath, Courtney) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/19 8:40 AM
COMPLAINT Robert McClintock against Poomjai Pollawit Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10322954 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Robert McClintock.(Delle, Robert). Modified on 3/19/2024 to add Attachment: #3 Exhibit that was filed as one document with Complaint (Figueroa, Tamara) |
|
Att: 1 Category Form, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |