Owens v. Secretary, Department of Corrections
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas P Barber |
Referred: | Philip R Lammens |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00129 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
transfer
Division transfer out
Fri 03/22 10:44 AM
TRANSFER to Tampa Division and assigned case number 8:24-cv-717-WFJ-NHA (EAM) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order transferring case to another division
Wed 03/20 8:27 AM
ORDER transferring case to Tampa Division of this Court; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 3/20/2024. (KLS) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 03/19 9:29 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State filed by Gregory Owens. (No fees paid)(LAB) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope |