SLA Investments, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 2:24-bk-12079
Lead case is: 2:24-bk-12079
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Vincent P Zurzolo |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-12082 |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
SLA Investments, LLC
1040 S Los Angeles St
Los Angeles, CA 90015-4755 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Amended List of Creditors (Fee)
Wed 04/10 12:13 AM
Amendment to List of Creditors. Fee Amount $34 Filed by Debtor SLA Investments, LLC. (Talerico, Derrick) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 04/10 12:15 AM
Receipt of Amended List of Creditors (Fee)([LINK:2:24-bk-12082-VZ] ) [misc,amdcm] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56719577. Fee amount 34.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Tue 04/09 11:24 PM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) , Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule D Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule E/F Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) , List of Equity Security Holders , Statement of Corporate Ownership filed., Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) Filed by Debtor SLA Investments, LLC . (Talerico, Derrick) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice
Mon 04/08 10:08 AM
Notice Notice of Joint Administration of Cases and Requirements for Filing Documents Filed by Debtor SLA Investments, LLC . (Talerico, Derrick) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Wed 04/03 9:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/03/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
order
Joint Administration (BNC-PDF)
Mon 04/01 4:32 PM
ORDER Granting Debtor's motion to approve joint administration of cases; ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; jointly administrated with case numbers - 2:24-bk-12079-VZ; 2:24-bk-12074-VZ; 2:24-bk-12075-VZ; 2:24-bk-12076-VZ; 2:24-bk-12080-VZ; 2:24-bk-12081-VZ; 2:24-bk-12091-VZ "for additional information refer to image" (BNC-PDF) Signed on 4/1/2024. (TJ) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
nef
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Thu 03/28 12:04 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by James, Jacqueline. (James, Jacqueline) |
|
Sunday, March 24, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Sun 03/24 9:15 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/24/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Fri 03/22 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 03/22/2024. (Admin.) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Declaration
Fri 03/22 12:03 PM
Declaration re: Notice of Declarations of Martha E. Araki, Sachie Fritz and Yerika Ramirez Regarding Provision of Telephonic Notice and Service of Debtors Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor SLA Investments, LLC . (Talerico, Derrick) |
|
14 | 14
order
X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF)
Fri 03/22 10:22 AM
Order (1) Setting Conference on Status of Reorganization Case; (2) Requiring Debtor-in Possession to Appear at Status Conference And File Report on Status of Reorganization Case, or Face Possible (A) Conversion of Case to Chapter 7; (B) Dismissal of Case; or (c) Appointment of Trustee; (3) Requiring Compliance With Standards Re Employment And Fee Applications; (4) Giving Notice of Probable Use of Court-AppointedExpertWitness For Contested Valuation Requests; (5) Mandating Use of Forms For Disclosure Statement And Plan; And (6) Establishing Procedure For (A) Motion For Order Approving Adequacy of Disclosure Statement; And (B) Motion For Order Confirming Plan (BNC-PDF) Signed on 3/22/2024 (NV) |
|
court
Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Fri 03/22 10:23 AM
Hearing Set Hearing to be held on 05/09/2024 at 10:00 AM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1368 Los Angeles, CA 90012. The hearing judge is Vincent Zurzolo (NV) |
||
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Thu 03/21 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/21/2024. (Admin.) |
|
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Thu 03/21 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/21/2024. (Admin.) |
|
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Thu 03/21 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/21/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
nef
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Wed 03/20 11:44 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Poltrock, Bruce. (Poltrock, Bruce) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Hearing (BK Case)
Wed 03/20 11:39 AM
Notice of Hearing Notice of Motion for Debtors Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor SLA Investments, LLC . (Talerico, Derrick) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Joint Administration (motion)
Wed 03/20 11:37 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Debtors Motion for Joint Administration; Declaration of Alan D. Gomperts in Support Thereof Filed by Debtor SLA Investments, LLC (Talerico, Derrick) |
|
7 | 7
nef
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Wed 03/20 11:33 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Fletcher, Michael. (Fletcher, Michael) |
|
6 | 6
nef
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Wed 03/20 11:25 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Warrington, Gerrick. (Warrington, Gerrick) |
|
5 | 5
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1)
Wed 03/20 9:33 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/3/2024 at 12:00 PM at UST-LA3, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-811-2961, PARTICIPANT CODE:9609127. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/2/2024. (LL2) |
|
court
Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Wed 03/20 12:25 PM
Hearing Set Hearing to be held on 03/25/2024 at 11:00 AM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1368 Los Angeles, CA 90012. The hearing judge is Vincent Zurzolo (NV) |
||
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF)
Tue 03/19 5:49 PM
Order Setting Hearing(s) (BNC-PDF) Signed on 3/19/2024 (NV) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Deficiency Notice (11 U.S.C. Sec. 521 & Rule 1007) (Ch 11/12) (manual - def) (BNC)
Tue 03/19 3:41 PM
Notice of Case Deficiency Under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 521(a)(1) and Bankruptcy Rule 1007 (BNC) (SC2) |
|
2 | 2
court
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required
Tue 03/19 3:39 PM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Debtor(s) mailing address was entered in the system instead of the street address. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (SC2) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tue 03/19 7:46 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by SLA Investments, LLC Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 04/2/2024. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 04/2/2024. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 04/2/2024. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 04/2/2024. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 04/2/2024. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 04/2/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 04/2/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 04/2/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 04/2/2024. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 04/2/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 04/2/2024. (Talerico, Derrick) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 03/19 7:47 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:2:24-bk-12082] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56627945. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
misc
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco)
Tue 03/19 3:38 PM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) List of Equity Security Holders due 4/2/2024. (SC2) |