Negev Investments, LLC
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Magdalena Reyes Bordeaux |
Case #: | 6:24-bk-11332 |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2024 |
Terminated: | Mar 19, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Negev Investments, LLC
12800 Foxdale Dr
Desert Hot Springs, CA 92240-4638 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501 |
Docket last updated: 83 minutes ago |
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Thu 03/21 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/21/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 03/19 1:26 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed - CASE TRANSFER OUT. The above referenced case has been transferred. An order was approved and entered. This case is therefore closed. (WJ6) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Comments
Tue 03/19 12:26 PM
Comments: CM/ECF Intradistrict Transfer feature used to transfer case from RS Division to LA Division (New Case Number 2:24-bk-12091-VZ. Previous Case Number: 6:24-bk-11332-RB). (LL2) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice of reassignment of case (BNC)
Tue 03/19 10:55 AM
Notice of reassignment of case (BNC) (CJ) |
|
2 | 2
order
Change venue/Intra-district Transfer - Bankruptcy (No Motion) (BNC-PDF)
Tue 03/19 10:49 AM
Order To Transfer Case To Another Division and Reassigning Bankruptcy Case Pursuant to General Order 11-01 to Judge with Prior Related Case/Proceeding. It is hereby Ordered that the above-captioned bankruptcy case be reassigned to Bankruptcy Judge Vincent P. Zurzolo (BNC-PDF). Signed on 3/19/2024. (CJ) |
|
1 | 1
11
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tue 03/19 7:53 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Negev Investments, LLC List of Equity Security Holders due 04/2/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 04/2/2024. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 04/2/2024. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 04/2/2024. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 04/2/2024. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 04/2/2024. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 04/2/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 04/2/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 04/2/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 04/2/2024. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 04/2/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 04/2/2024. (Talerico, Derrick) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 03/19 7:55 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:6:24-bk-11332] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56627975. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Case Reassigned (Manual)
Tue 03/19 10:54 AM
Judge Vincent P. Zurzolo added to case due to related cases. Involvement of Judge Magdalena Reyes Bordeaux Terminated (CJ) |
||
court
Case Reassigned (Manual)
Tue 03/19 11:06 AM
Judge Magdalena Reyes Bordeaux added to case. Involvement of Judge Vincent P. Zurzolo Terminated (CJ) |