USA v. FEVRIER
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Myong J Joun |
Case #: | 1:24-mc-91143 |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2024 |
Terminated: | Mar 19, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict
Fri 04/26 10:03 AM
Judge Myong J. Joun: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING 4 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to Indict to June 3, 2024. (York, Steve) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Motion for Extension of Time to Indict
Thu 04/25 4:26 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict to June 3, 2024 Responses due by 5/9/2024 |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict
Tue 03/19 1:20 PM
Judge Myong J. Joun: ORDER entered granting 1 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict. (Dore, Samantha) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/19/2024) (Dore, Samantha) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Tue 03/19 10:40 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Myong J. Joun assigned to case. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Motion for Extension of Time to Indict
Tue 03/19 9:05 AM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict and Exclusion of Time Under the Speedy Trial Act to May 2, 2024 Responses due by 4/2/2024 |