Pointer v. United States of America
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Hala Y Jarbou |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00283 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 04/15 9:25 AM
ORDER granting12 motion for extension of time to file attorney affidavits by 5/15/2024; Government to respond to 2255 within 60 days from the filing of the affidavits, Plaintiff may reply within 14 days thereafter; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Mon 04/15 1:55 PM
Copy of Order on Motion for Extension of Time14 sent via U.S. Mail to Kenneth Christopher Pointer #46291-039 (pjw) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence
Fri 04/12 1:40 PM
CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to file Affidavits and Brief in Support 12 filed by United States of America (Roth, Jonathan) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 04/12 1:39 PM
MOTION for extension of time to file Affidavits and Brief in Support by respondent United States of America; (Roth, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Brief in Support of a Motion
Wed 04/10 8:49 AM
BRIEF in support of PRO SE MOTION to vacate, set aside or correct sentence (2255) 1 (titled Memorandum of Law in Support of granting Movant Pointer's 2255 Petition) with certificate of service filed by Kenneth Christopher Pointer (pjw) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 03/25 2:46 PM
ORDER granting7 motion waiving attorney-client privilege and extending deadlines; if attorneys intend to file affidavits they shall do so by 4/24/2024; Government to respond to 2255 within 60 days from the filing of the affidavits, Plaintiff may reply within 14 days thereafter; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs) |
|
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 03/25 2:28 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part2 motion for extension of time to file 2255 brief; brief to be filed by 4/8/2024; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Mon 03/25 3:30 PM
Copy of Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File9 and Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply10 sent via U.S. Mail to Kenneth Christopher Pointer #46291-039 (pjw) |
||
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence
Fri 03/22 3:12 PM
CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re1 and for Order Authorizing Release of Information Subject to Attorney-Client Privilege 7 filed by United States of America (Roth, Jonathan) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 03/22 3:11 PM
MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re1 and for Order Authorizing Release of Information Subject to Attorney-Client Privilege by respondent United States of America; (Roth, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 03/21 3:52 PM
RESPONSE TO MOTION for extension of time to file Brief in Support of 2255 Motion with certificate of service 2 filed by United States of America (Roth, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
utility
Copies Mailed
Wed 03/20 7:47 AM
Copy of Order Regarding Response to Motion5 , Order Regarding Response to Motion4 sent via U.S. Mail to Kenneth Christopher Pointer (jjm) |
||
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Regarding Response to Motion
Tue 03/19 4:39 PM
ORDER TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHER PLEADING as to Kenneth Christopher Pointer: the U.S. Attorney to answer the motion to vacate, set aside or correct sentence within 60 days; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order Regarding Response to Motion
Tue 03/19 4:35 PM
ORDER regarding response to Motion for Extension of Time to File2 response due by 4/2/2024; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Receipt of Case Notice
Tue 03/19 9:36 AM
NOTICE of receipt of case (pjw) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Tue 03/19 3:36 PM
Copy of Receipt of Case Notice3 sent via U.S. Mail to Kenneth Christopher Pointer #46291-039, Jonathan Roth, Kristin Michelle Pinkston (eod) |
||
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 03/19 9:34 AM
MOTION for extension of time to file Brief in Support of 2255 Motion with certificate of service by petitioner Kenneth Christopher Pointer; (pjw) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Tue 03/19 9:32 AM
PRO SE MOTION to vacate, set aside or correct sentence (2255) filed by Kenneth Christopher Pointer (pjw) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment A |