Owen v. Meijer, Inc.
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Jane M Beckering |
Referred: | Ray Kent |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00290 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 15, 2024 4:56 AM EDT |
defendant
Meijer, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
James R. Owen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting proposed stipulated order5 ; this matter is dismissed with prejudice, and without costs, interest, or attorney fees; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() STIPULATION of dismissal with Prejudice by defendant Meijer, Inc. (Lintemuth, Elisa) |
|
notice
Attorney Appearance
Mon 04/08 9:30 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Elisa Jean Lintemuth on behalf of defendant Meijer, Inc. (Lintemuth, Elisa) |
||
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Meijer, Inc. (ns) |
|
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Jane M. Beckering (ns) |
|
2 | 2
![]() PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Westbrook, Theodore) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Meijer, Inc. filed by James R. Owen (Westbrook, Theodore) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
misc
Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment
Tue 03/19 10:12 AM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff James R. Owen in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7323664 (Westbrook, Theodore) |