California Northern District Court
Judge:Nathanael M Cousins
Case #: 5:24-cv-01684
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2024
Terminated:Apr 02, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 15, 2024 2:25 AM PDT
Defendant
Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff
Geraldine Freeman
Represented By
Neda Farah
Farah Law, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 04/02 9:43 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (without prejudice) by Geraldine Freeman (Farah, Neda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 03/19 11:43 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/12/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/19/2024 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Telephonic Only. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 03/19 9:36 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/2/2024. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 03/19 8:51 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Geraldine Freeman. (Farah, Neda) Modified on 3/19/2024 (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/19 8:44 AM
COMPLAINT against Sequium Asset Solutions, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19234048.). Filed by Geraldine Freeman.(Farah, Neda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Credit Report,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet