Hvizdo v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Anne C Conway |
Referred: | Daniel C Irick |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00533 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1362 ERISA |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 19, 2024 2:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Dale Hvizdo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 04/22 1:48 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Aetna Life Insurance Company must respond to the Complaint by 5/9/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 4/22/2024. (Irick, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint
Tue 04/16 2:40 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re9 Amended Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Fordin, Jonathan) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 04/12 11:26 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company filed by Dale Hvizdo.(Coffman, William) Modified on 4/12/2024 to remove capitalization (ARL) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit LTD Insurance Policy | ||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Mon 04/08 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by William S. Coffman, Jr on behalf of Dale Hvizdo. Lead Counsel: William S. Coffman, Jr.. (Coffman, William) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Thu 04/04 1:16 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Dale Hvizdo. Related case(s): No (Coffman, William) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/04 11:13 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Dale Hvizdo. (Coffman, William) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Interested Persons Order
Tue 03/26 2:32 PM
INITIAL CASE ORDER (ERISA)- Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Parties have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 3/26/2024. (KLD) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons issued
Tue 03/19 3:58 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (ARL) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Tue 03/19 12:34 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jeanne Cremeens, Patrick Cremeens, and William Coffman of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/19 12:33 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:24-cv-533-ACC-DCI. (ARL) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/19 11:28 AM
COMPLAINT against Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21885514) filed by Dale Hvizdo.(Coffman, William) Modified on 3/19/2024 as to docket text (ARL) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A for Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |