Randall v. Ideal Image Development Corporation et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Kathryn Kimball Mizelle |
Referred: | Amanda Arnold Sansone |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00695 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 19, 2024 2:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
IDEAL IMAGE OF SOUTH CAROLINA LLC
|
|
Defendant
Ideal Image Development Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Michele Randall
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Hearing / Conference
Wed 04/24 2:38 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 13 Motion for IDEAL Case Management Conference: Videoconference set for 5/1/2024 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. The court will send counsel an calendar entry containing a link to the videoconference information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 4/24/2024. (BEE) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Hearing / Conference
Tue 04/23 10:11 AM
Joint MOTION for Case Management Conference re3 Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program by Ideal Image Development Corporation, Ideal Image of South Carolina LLC. (Howard, Christine) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 04/17 9:42 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Response due by 5/1/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 4/17/2024. (BEE) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Wed 04/17 8:23 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Elysse Victoria Gorney of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JDR) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/16 4:02 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Ideal Image Development Corporation, Ideal Image of South Carolina LLC. (Howard, Christine) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of appearance
Tue 04/16 3:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elysse Victoria Gorney on behalf of Ideal Image Development Corporation, Ideal Image of South Carolina LLC (Gorney, Elysse) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Tue 04/16 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Christine E. Howard on behalf of Ideal Image Development Corporation, Ideal Image of South Carolina LLC. Lead Counsel: Christine Howard. (Howard, Christine) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint
Tue 04/16 3:01 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Ideal Image Development Corporation, Ideal Image of South Carolina LLC. (Howard, Christine) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Thu 03/21 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Richard David Tuschman on behalf of Michele Randall. Lead Counsel: Richard Tuschman. (Tuschman, Richard) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons issued
Thu 03/21 10:19 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Ideal Image Development Corporation, Ideal Image of South Carolina LLC. (LNR) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Thu 03/21 10:05 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LNR) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program
Wed 03/20 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (ABC) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/19 2:32 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:24-cv-695-KKM-AAS. (AJS) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/19 12:36 PM
COMPLAINT against IDEAL IMAGE OF SOUTH CAROLINA LLC, Ideal Image Development Corporation with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21886131) filed by Michele Randall.(Tuschman, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons |