New York Southern District Court
Judge:J Paul Oetken
Case #: 1:24-cv-02048
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1333in Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 15, 2024 5:11 AM EDT
Defendant
Jonathan Majors
Represented By
Rory Garrett Greebel
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Grace Jabbari
Represented By
Brittany Henderson
Edwards Henderson
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, November 21, 2024
23 23 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 11/21 5:39 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Jonathan Majors pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Grace Jabbari. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Henderson, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
22 22 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 11/12 2:58 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Granted in part. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before December 20, 2024. The parties shall still appear for the scheduled conference on November 26, 2024. Counsel should call (888) 557-8511 at the scheduled time. The access code is 9300838. As previously ordered at ECF No. 20, the parties shall file a proposed case management plan at least three business days prior to the conference. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (djh)
Related: [-]
21 21 2 pgs motion Extension of Time Tue 11/12 9:01 AM
SEVENTH LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Rory G. Greebel dated November 12, 2024. Document filed by Jonathan Majors..(Greebel, Rory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
20 20 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 10/15 11:38 AM
ORDER granting19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Granted. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before November 21, 2024. The initial conference previously scheduled for November 7, 2024 is ADJOURNED. The parties shall appear for an initial conference on November 26, 2024 at 2:30 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Counsel should call (888) 557-8511 at the scheduled time. The access code is 9300838. As previously ordered at ECF No. 16, the parties shall file a proposed case management plan at least three business days prior to the conference. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (djh)
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs motion Extension of Time Tue 10/15 11:12 AM
SIXTH LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Rory G. Greebel dated October 15, 2024. Document filed by Jonathan Majors..(Greebel, Rory)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 09/20 10:20 AM
ORDER granting17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Granted. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before October 29, 2024. The initial conference previously scheduled for October 10, 2024 is ADJOURNED. The parties shall appear for an initial conference on November 7, 2024 at 12:00 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Counsel should call (888) 557-8511 at the scheduled time. The access code is 9300838. As previously ordered at ECF No. 16, the parties shall file a proposed case management plan at least three business days prior to the conference. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (djh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
17 17 motion Extension of Time Thu 09/19 11:58 AM
FIFTH LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Rory G. Greebel dated September 19, 2024. Document filed by Jonathan Majors..(Greebel, Rory)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
16 16 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 08/30 10:26 AM
ORDER granting15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Granted. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before October 8, 2024. The initial conference previously scheduled for September 5, 2024 is ADJOURNED. The parties shall appear for an initial conference on October 10, 2024 at 12:00 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Counsel should call (888) 557-8511 at the scheduled time. The access code is 9300838. As previously ordered at ECF No. 12, the parties shall file a proposed case management plan at least three business days prior to the conference. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (djh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
15 15 2 pgs motion Extension of Time Thu 08/29 2:48 PM
FOURTH LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Rory G. Greebel dated August 29, 2024. Document filed by Jonathan Majors..(Greebel, Rory)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 08/02 11:48 AM
ORDER granting13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Granted. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before September 19, 2024. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (djh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
13 13 2 pgs motion Extension of Time Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 08/01 5:37 PM
THIRD LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Rory G. Greebel dated August 1, 2024., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Rory G. Greebel dated August 1, 2024. Document filed by Jonathan Majors..(Greebel, Rory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 07/17 12:47 PM
ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/5/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Counsel should call (888) 557-8511 at the scheduled time. The access code is 9300838. Counsel who appear at the pretrial conference must be authorized to negotiate terms of settlement. Members of the public may join but are instructed to place their phones on mute. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/17/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 07/17 12:45 PM
ORDER granting10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time; terminating9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before August 15, 2024. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions at ECF Nos. 9 and 10. So ordered. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/17/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 07/17 12:45 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Jonathan Majors answer due 8/15/2024. (vfr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time Tue 07/16 10:59 PM
SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Correction to ECF docket number 9 addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Rory G. Greebel dated July 16, 2024. Document filed by Jonathan Majors..(Greebel, Rory)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time Tue 07/16 10:52 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Rory G. Greebel dated July 16, 2024. Document filed by Jonathan Majors..(Greebel, Rory)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/16 10:49 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rory Garrett Greebel on behalf of Jonathan Majors..(Greebel, Rory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 05/08 3:26 PM
ORDER granting6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Granted. Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before July 16, 2024. So ordered. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (nhb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 05/03 12:42 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:3 Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Brittany Henderson dated 05/03/2024. Document filed by Grace Jabbari..(Henderson, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 03/26 12:13 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jonathan Majors. (vf)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 03/25 10:56 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jonathan Majors, re:3 Complaint. Document filed by Grace Jabbari..(Henderson, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
3 3 23 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 03/20 2:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Jonathan Majors. Document filed by Grace Jabbari..(Henderson, Brittany)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Wed 03/20 9:39 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brittany Henderson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 6 (Foreign Nation). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 3 (Citizen or Subject of a Foreign Country). (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Wed 03/20 9:41 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Brittany Henderson to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct. The pleading title is not provided. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 3/25/2024. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 03/20 2:37 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 03/20 2:38 PM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 03/20 2:38 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
2 2 2 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 03/19 1:40 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Henderson, Brittany)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/19 1:11 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Jonathan Majors. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29099938)Document filed by Grace Jabbari..(Henderson, Brittany) Modified on 3/20/2024 (vf)
Related: [-]