Nankov v. United States Postal Service
New York Western District Court | |
Judge: | Elizabeth A Wolford |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-06166 |
Nature of Suit | 240 Real Property - Torts to Land |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Town of Greece Justice Court, Small Claims Part, 24030283 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 19, 2024 2:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
United States Postal Service
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 03/26 9:17 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER re2 Motion to Dismiss. (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference.) Responses due by 4/23/2024. Replies due by 4/30/2024. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 03/26/2024. (CAL) |
|
utility
Remark
Tue 03/26 9:23 AM
Remark : Clerk Mailed Copy of Scheduling Order to Dan Nankov. (DAF) |
||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 03/25 4:08 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Postal Service re3 Continuation of Exhibits,2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [2-2] Memorandum of Law (Khalil, Adam) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Continuation of Exhibits
Mon 03/25 3:33 PM
CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction -- Declaration of Herbst with signature properly visible . (Khalil, Adam) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 03/25 2:23 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States Postal Service.(Khalil, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Kimberly A. Herbst, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support | ||
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 03/20 11:12 AM
Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. Notification to chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JHF) |
||
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge
Wed 03/20 11:13 AM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (JHF) |
||
adr
Automatic Referral to Mediation
Wed 03/20 11:19 AM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Pursuant to Section 2.1(A) of the Plan for Alternative Dispute Resolution in the United States District Court for the Western District of New York (the ADR Plan), this case is automatically referred to ADR. To access the ADR Plan and for inquiries regarding the Court's ADR Program please review the Court's[LINK:ADR webpage] and/or contact the Court's ADR Administrator at[LINK:adrprogram@nywd.uscourts.gov] .' Prior to the Local Rule 16 scheduling conference, counsel and unrepresented parties shall review the [LINK:ADR Plan] and confer with each other regarding ADR for this case. Unless the parties agree to a different intervention, it is presumed they will participate in mediation. The parties shall be prepared to report on the outcome of their ADR discussion at the scheduling conference, as the initial Scheduling Order for this case will establish ADR deadlines in accordance with the ADR Plan. (JHF) |
||
utility
Remark
Wed 03/20 11:22 AM
Clerk mailed1 Notification of Removal and copy of docket report to pro se plaintiff. (JHF) |
||
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 03/19 11:58 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Postal Service from Town of Greece Justice Court, Small Claims Part, case number 24030283., filed by United States Postal Service.(Khalil, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Index to Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Index to Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |