Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:24-bk-80053

Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Clifton R Jessup Jr
Case #: 8:24-ap-80028
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2024
Terminated:Nov 14, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jeffrey Raymond Bradford
2108 County Road 55
Moulton, AL 35650
Represented By
G. John Dezenberg, Jr.
Dezenberg & Smith, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Gulfco of Alabama, LLC d/b/a Tower Loan of Decatur
Kent D. McPhail P.O. Box 870
Mobile, AL 36601
Represented By
Kent D McPhail
Mcphail Sanchez, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, November 14, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Thu 11/14 11:54 AM
Adversary Case 8:24-ap-80028 Closed (ksv)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 19, 2024
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 10/19 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 10/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement
Thursday, October 17, 2024
25 25 order Approve Compromise and/or Settlement Thu 10/17 3:35 PM
Agreed Order Approving Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement Related [+] Signed on 10/17/2024. (ksv)
Related: [-] #19
Thursday, October 03, 2024
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 10/04 8:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 10/03/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Notice of Hearing
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
22 22 court Notice of Hearing-Van200 Tue 10/01 11:16 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] on Hearing scheduled 10/7/2024 at 10:00 AM at United States Courthouse, 660 Gallatin St SW, Courtroom I (CRJ) Huntsville. (ksv)
Related: [-] entered to serve Trustee and BA19 Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement filed by Plaintiff Gulfco of Alabama, LLC d/b/a Tower Loan of Decatur
Saturday, September 14, 2024
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 09/14 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 09/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Notice of Hearing
Thursday, September 12, 2024
20 20 court Notice of Hearing-Van200 Thu 09/12 2:15 PM
Notice of Hearing on Related [+] Hearing scheduled 10/7/2024 at 10:00 AM at 1st Floor Courtroom (CRJ) Huntsville. (ksv)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement filed by Plaintiff Gulfco of Alabama, LLC d/b/a Tower Loan of Decatur
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
19 19 motion Approve Compromise and/or Settlement - Motion Wed 09/11 3:58 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement Regarding Adversary Complaint to Determine Dischargeability Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Gulfco of Alabama, LLC d/b/a Tower Loan of Decatur (McPhail, Kent)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, August 23, 2024
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 08/24 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 08/23/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order (Generic)
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
17 17 misc Report to Court Wed 08/21 3:19 PM
Report to Court Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff Gulfco of Alabama, LLC d/b/a Tower Loan of Decatur. (McPhail, Kent)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Corrective Entry Wed 08/21 3:18 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY wrong docket event used Filed by Plaintiff Gulfco of Alabama, LLC d/b/a Tower Loan of Decatur Related [+]. (McPhail, Kent)
Related: [-] 14 Notice of Incorrect Event/Filing
15 15 1 pgs order Order (Generic-no hearing) Wed 08/21 8:39 AM
Order Vacating Trial and All Remaining Deadlines Signed on 8/21/2024. (ksv)
Related: [-]
14 14 court Incorrect Event (Notice of) Wed 08/21 7:17 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Kent McPhail, attorney for Plaintiff, has used the wrong docket event when filing the Notice of Settlement. SOLUTION: The filer, Kent McPhail, attorney for Plaintiff, should enter a corrective entry stating "Wrong docket event used" and refile using the correct docket event located at Adversary > Notices > Report to Court and enter "Notice of Settlement" in the docket text. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. Related [+] (ksv)
Related: [-] 13 Settlement Agreement filed by Plaintiff Gulfco of Alabama, LLC d/b/a Tower Loan of Decatur
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
13 13 misc Settlement Agreement Tue 08/20 2:31 PM
Settlement Agreement Notice Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Gulfco of Alabama, LLC d/b/a Tower Loan of Decatur. (McPhail, Kent)
Related: [-] 1 1 Complaint
Monday, August 05, 2024
12 12 court Exhibit and Witness List Mon 08/05 4:16 PM
Exhibit and Witness List Filed by Plaintiff Gulfco of Alabama, LLC d/b/a Tower Loan of Decatur Related [+].(McPhail, Kent)
Related: [-] 9 Pre-Trial Order Signed on 5/30/2024. Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/28/2024 at 10:00 AM at Huntsville Federal Building (CRJ). Trial date set for 9/4/2024 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom (CRJ) Decatur. (ksv)
Att: 1 Exhibit
11 11 court Exhibit and Witness List Mon 08/05 10:09 AM
Exhibit and Witness List Filed by Defendant Jeffrey Raymond Bradford Related [+]. (Dezenberg, G.)
Related: [-] 9 Pre-Trial Order Signed on 5/30/2024. Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/28/2024 at 10:00 AM at Huntsville Federal Building (CRJ). Trial date set for 9/4/2024 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom (CRJ) Decatur. (ksv)
Saturday, June 01, 2024
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 06/01 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 06/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Pre-Trial Order
Thursday, May 30, 2024
9 9 order Pre-Trial Order Thu 05/30 10:12 AM
Pre-Trial Order Signed on 5/30/2024. Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/28/2024 at 10:00 AM at Huntsville Federal Building (CRJ). Trial date set for 9/4/2024 at 10:00 AM at 3rd Floor Courtroom (CRJ) Decatur. (ksv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 04/18 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 04/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order and Notice of Status Conference
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order and Notice of Status Conference Tue 04/16 12:56 PM
Order Scheduling Status Conference Signed on 4/16/2024. Status hearing to be held on 5/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at Huntsville Federal Building (CRJ). (ksv)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/12 1:17 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Jeffrey Raymond Bradford. (Dezenberg, G.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 03/20 3:48 PM
Summons Service Executed on Jeffrey Raymond Bradford 3/20/2024 (McPhail, Kent)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Tue 03/19 10:01 AM
Summons Issued Jeffrey Raymond Bradford Date Issued 3/19/2024, Answer Due 4/18/2024 (ksv)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
2 2 misc Corporate Parent Disclosure Statement Mon 03/18 3:31 PM
Corporate Parent Disclosure Statement Filed by Plaintiff Gulfco of Alabama, LLC d/b/a Tower Loan of Decatur. (McPhail, Kent)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/18 1:55 PM
Adversary case 24-80028 62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) Complaint by Gulfco of Alabama, LLC d/b/a Tower Loan of Decatur against Jeffrey Raymond Bradford. Fee Amount $350 (McPhail, Kent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A