New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Dora Lizette Irizarry
Referred: James R Cho
Case #: 1:24-cv-02010
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 15, 2024 4:58 AM EDT
Defendant
Ruben Levy
Represented By
Gary Tsirelman
Gary Tsirelman P.C.
contact info
Peter M. Birzon
Peter Birzon & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Laisa Ene Pertet
N/a
contact info
Defendant
Roman Matatov
Represented By
Gary Tsirelman
Gary Tsirelman P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Urban Medical, P.C.
Represented By
Steven J. Harfenist
Harfenist Kraut & Perlstein, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Summit Medical Services, P.C.
Represented By
Steven J. Harfenist
Harfenist Kraut & Perlstein, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Spruce Medical & Diagnostic, P.C.
Represented By
Steven J. Harfenist
Harfenist Kraut & Perlstein, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sovereign Medical Services, P.C.
Represented By
Steven J. Harfenist
Harfenist Kraut & Perlstein, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Preferred Medical, P.C.
Represented By
Steven J. Harfenist
Harfenist Kraut & Perlstein, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Paramount Medical Services, P.C.
Represented By
Steven J. Harfenist
Harfenist Kraut & Perlstein, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Uriyel Mirzakandov
Represented By
Gary Tsirelman
Gary Tsirelman P.C.
contact info
Peter M. Birzon
Peter Birzon & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Laisa Ene Pertet
N/a
contact info
Defendant
Macintosh Medical, P.C.
Represented By
Steven J. Harfenist
Harfenist Kraut & Perlstein, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jonathan S. Landow, M.D.
Represented By
Steven J. Harfenist
Harfenist Kraut & Perlstein, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Viviane Etienne, M.D.
Represented By
Steven J. Harfenist
Harfenist Kraut & Perlstein, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Empire Medical Services, P.C.
Represented By
Steven J. Harfenist
Harfenist Kraut & Perlstein, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Eastern Medical Practice, P.C.
Represented By
Steven J. Harfenist
Harfenist Kraut & Perlstein, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Birch Medical & Diagnostic, P.C.
Represented By
Steven J. Harfenist
Harfenist Kraut & Perlstein, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Atlantic Medical & Diagnostic, P.C.
Represented By
Steven J. Harfenist
Harfenist Kraut & Perlstein, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Shauna L Sullivan
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Nathan A. Tilden
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Hugh Brady
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Shauna L Sullivan
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Nathan A. Tilden
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Hugh Brady
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By
Shauna L Sullivan
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Nathan A. Tilden
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Hugh Brady
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By
Shauna L Sullivan
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Nathan A. Tilden
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
Hugh Brady
King, Tilden, Mcettrick & Brink, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Roman Israilov
Terminated: 05/29/2024


Docket last updated: 70 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
92 92 service Affidavit of Service Tue 05/20 4:37 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service on non-parties, Amira Nasser, P.A., GreenBills LLC, and Universal Billing & Collection, Inc. pursuant to the May 16, 2025 Court Order , filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Brady, Hugh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1_May 16, 2025 correspondence sent to Amira Nasser, P.A., GreenBills LLC, and Universal Billing & Collection, Inc.
Monday, May 19, 2025
91 91 service Affidavit of Service Mon 05/19 10:09 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service on non-party, Four Square Physical Therapy, P.C. pursuant to the May 16, 2025 Court Order , filed by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Brady, Hugh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1_May 16, 2025 correspondence sent to Four Square and UPS delivery confirmation
Friday, May 16, 2025
order Order on Motion to Compel Fri 05/16 11:32 AM
ORDER: Non-party Four Square Physical Therapy, P.C. ("Four Square") failed to appear for the hearing on plaintiffs' motion (Dkt. 76) to compel Four Square to respond to plaintiffs' subpoena. See Dkt. entry dated 4/16/2025; Dkt. 85. Plaintiffs' counsel served Four Square with notice of the hearing. Dkt. 83. Plaintiffs advised the Court that Four Square has not responded to the subpoena. Given that Four Square failed to object to the motion to compel and failed to appear for the 4/16/2025 motion hearing, the Court grants plaintiffs' motion to compel (Dkt. 76). By 5/30/2025, Four Square shall provide full responses to plaintiffs' subpoena. By 5/21/2025, plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Order on Four Square and file proof of service on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 5/16/2025. (SGC)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Fri 05/16 3:44 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER re:88 ,89 ,90 Letter MOTION to Compel non-parties filed by plaintiffs. By 5/29/2025 , non parties Universal Billing & Collection, Inc., GreenBills LLC, and Amira Nasser, P.A. (the "non-parties") shall file a response to the motion to compel. A Telephonic Motion Hearing will be held on 6/9/2025 at 12:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Counsel for plaintiffs and the non-parties must appear. All other parties are excused from the conference. Each party is directed to call 571-353-2301 and enter Meeting ID 709-478-501#. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. If any party has difficulty accessing the conference, please contact Chambers at 718-613-2110. By 5/20/2025 , plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Order on the non-parties and file proof of service on ECF.Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 5/16/2025. (JDP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
90 90 motion Compel Thu 05/15 3:50 PM
Letter MOTION to Compel pursuant to section F.4 of Your Honor's Individual Rules as to non-party, Universal Billing & Collection, Inc. by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Brady, Hugh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A_Subpoena to Universal Billing & Collection, Inc.,
Att: 2 Exhibit B_Affidavit of Service of Universal Billing & Collection, Inc. dated June 19, 2024,
Att: 3 Exhibit C_New York Department of State Corporate Records,
Att: 4 Exhibit D_Allstate's Deficiency Letters sent on September 10, 2024 and January 8, 2025
89 89 motion Compel Thu 05/15 3:45 PM
Letter MOTION to Compel pursuant to section F.4 of Your Honor's Individual Rules as to non-party, GreenBills LLC by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Brady, Hugh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A_Subpoena to GreenBills LLC,
Att: 2 Exhibit B_Affidavit of Service of GreenBills LLC dated June 18, 2024,
Att: 3 Exhibit C_New York Department of State Corporate Records,
Att: 4 Exhibit D_Allstate's Deficiency Letters sent on September 10, 2024 and January 8, 2025
88 88 motion Compel Thu 05/15 3:40 PM
Letter MOTION to Compel pursuant to section F.4 of Your Honor's Individual Rules as to non-party, Amira Nasser, P.A. by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Brady, Hugh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A_Subpoena to Amira Nasser, P.A.,
Att: 2 Exhibit B_Affidavit of Service of Amira Nasser, P.A. dated March 13, 2025,
Att: 3 Exhibit C_Allstate's Deficiency Letter sent on April 29, 2025,
Att: 4 Exhibit D_Correspondence