Texas Northern District Court
Judge:James Wesley Hendrix
Case #: 5:24-cv-00076
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 15, 2024 4:44 AM CDT
Defendant
Summit Behavioral Health Care
389 Nichol Mill Lane, Suites 100 and 160
Franklin, TN 37067
Represented By
Maja Agnieszka Hartzell
Burr & Forman, LLP
contact info
Russell D Cawyer
Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP
contact info
Mary Leigh Pirtle
Bass Berry & Sims
contact info
Taylor J Winn
Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP
contact info
Defendant
The Ranch at Dove Tree, LLC
1406 Quinlan Street
Lubbock, TX 79403
Represented By
Maja Agnieszka Hartzell
Burr & Forman, LLP
contact info
Russell D Cawyer
Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP
contact info
Mary Leigh Pirtle
Bass Berry & Sims
contact info
Taylor J Winn
Kelly Hart & Hallman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Keisha O'Leary
3435 125th Street
Lubbock, TX 79423
Represented By
Walter D Willson
Wells Marble & Hurst PLLC
contact info
Rudy Beuttenmuller
Thomas Cinclair & Beuttenmuller PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
notice Notice of Manual Filing Wed 05/14 10:06 AM
Notice of Manual Filing - USB of Exhibit 15 received from Plaintiff Keisha O'Leary re80 Appendix in Support and forwarded to Judge's (JWH) chambers. (bdg)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 10, 2025
80 80 respm Appendix in Support Sat 05/10 12:15 AM
Appendix in Support filed by Keisha O'Leary re67 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Willson, Walter)
Related: [-]
79 79 respm Appendix in Support Sat 05/10 12:13 AM
Appendix in Support filed by Keisha O'Leary re67 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Willson, Walter)
Related: [-]
78 78 respm Appendix in Support Sat 05/10 12:12 AM
Appendix in Support filed by Keisha O'Leary re67 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Willson, Walter)
Related: [-]
77 77 respm Appendix in Support Sat 05/10 12:09 AM
Appendix in Support filed by Keisha O'Leary re67 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Willson, Walter)
Related: [-]
76 76 respm Appendix in Support Sat 05/10 12:05 AM
Appendix in Support filed by Keisha O'Leary re67 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Willson, Walter)
Related: [-]
75 75 respm Appendix in Support Sat 05/10 12:01 AM
Appendix in Support filed by Keisha O'Leary re67 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Willson, Walter)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
74 74 respm Appendix in Support Fri 05/09 11:59 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Keisha O'Leary re67 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Willson, Walter)
Related: [-]
73 73 respm Appendix in Support Fri 05/09 11:55 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Keisha O'Leary re67 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Willson, Walter)
Related: [-]
72 72 respm Appendix in Support Fri 05/09 11:51 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Keisha O'Leary re67 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Willson, Walter)
Related: [-]
71 71 respm Appendix in Support Fri 05/09 11:46 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Keisha O'Leary re67 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Willson, Walter)
Related: [-]
70 70 respm Appendix in Support Fri 05/09 11:44 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Keisha O'Leary re67 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Willson, Walter)
Related: [-]
69 69 respm Appendix in Support Fri 05/09 11:36 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Keisha O'Leary re67 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Willson, Walter)
Related: [-]
68 68 respm Appendix in Support Fri 05/09 11:33 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Keisha O'Leary re67 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Willson, Walter)
Related: [-]
67 67 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Fri 05/09 11:13 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Keisha O'Leary re66 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Willson, Walter)
Related: [-]
66 66 motion Partial Summary Judgment Fri 05/09 11:10 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Keisha O'Leary (Willson, Walter)
Related: [-]
65 65 respm Appendix in Support Fri 05/09 4:20 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Summit Behavioral Health Care, The Ranch at Dove Tree, LLC re64 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Pirtle, Mary Leigh)
Related: [-]
64 64 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Fri 05/09 4:18 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Summit Behavioral Health Care, The Ranch at Dove Tree, LLC re63 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Pirtle, Mary Leigh)
Related: [-]
63 63 motion Summary Judgment Fri 05/09 4:17 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Summit Behavioral Health Care, The Ranch at Dove Tree, LLC (Pirtle, Mary Leigh)
Related: [-]