Smatt, Jr. v. Flagler College, Inc.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Anne C Conway |
Referred: | Daniel C Irick |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00535 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2024 |
Terminated: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 19, 2024 5:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
FLAGLER COLLEGE
|
|
Plaintiff
Richard Smatt, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
transfer
Division transfer out
Thu 03/21 7:45 AM
TRANSFER to Jacksonville Division and assigned case number 3:24-cv-284-MMH-JBT. (RPB) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order transferring case to another division
Wed 03/20 5:02 PM
ORDER transferring case to the Jacksonville Division. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 3/20/2024. (KLD) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons issued
Wed 03/20 9:30 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Flagler College, Inc. (BGR) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 03/20 9:04 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:24-cv-535-ACC-DCI. (RLK) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/19 3:22 PM
COMPLAINT against FLAGLER COLLEGE with Jury Demand filed by Richard Smatt, Jr.(Duffie, Allison) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - EEOC Right to Sue, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Tuition Reimbursement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Salary, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons |