Granados v. State of Hawaii
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Derrick K Watson |
Referred: | Wes Reber Porter |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00130 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM HST |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
12
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 04/18 7:46 AM
ORDER DISMISSING PETITION WITH LEAVE TO AMEND AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 4/18/2024. (1) The Petition is DISMISSED with leave to amend on or before May 17, 2024. Failure to timely file an amended petition that cures the deficiencies noted above will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. (2) If Granados elects to file an amended petition, he is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing how his claims are fully exhausted and timely filed. (3) In the alternative, Granados may NOTIFY the court in writing on or before May 17, 2024 that he is voluntarily dismissing this action. (4) The Clerk shall SEND Granados a blank Petition under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody so that he can comply with the instructions in this Order. Show Cause Response due by 5/17/2024. (eta) |
|
misc
Court's Certificate of Service
Thu 04/18 7:54 AM
COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of4 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION WITH LEAVE TO AMEND AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and a blank Petition under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody have been served by First Class Mail to Zachary S. Granados at the address of record on April 18, 2024. (eta) |
||
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 04/15 1:19 PM
Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 2897 re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (eta) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
misc
Court's Certificate of Service
Tue 03/19 9:52 AM
COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of2 HABEAS DEFICIENCY ORDER has been served by First Class Mail to Zachary S. Granados at the address of record on March 19, 2024. A blank Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner, its instructions and a file-stamped copy of1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus was included in the mailing to Petitioner. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (eta) |
||
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/19 9:48 AM
HABEAS DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 3/18/2024. (eta) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 03/19 9:46 AM
PETITION Under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody - filed by Zachary S. Granados.(eta) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Documentation |