Kaleohano-Arakaki v. State of Hawaii et al
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Derrick K Watson |
Referred: | Rom Trader |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00131 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM HST |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
misc
Court's Certificate of Service
Tue 04/23 11:16 AM
COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of7 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS BY A PRISONER has been served by First Class Mail to Yasushi Kaleohano-Arakaki at the address of record on April 23, 2024. A copy of the order was served by First Class Mail to the Warden and Financial Office of Halawa Correctional Facility at 99-902 Moanalua Rd., Aiea, HI 96701 on April 23, 2024. DPS Litigation Coordinator Laurie Nadamoto, Esq. and the Financial Department for the District of Hawaii received the order electronically. (eta) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/22 5:14 PM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS BY A PRISONER re6 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 4/22/2024. (eta) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/19 3:06 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner - by Plaintiff Yasushi Kaleohano-Arakaki(eta) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner, | ||
Att: 3 Mailing Documentation | ||
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/19 10:15 AM
DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 3/18/2024. (eta) COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Yasushi Kaleohano-Arakaki has been served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Appoint Counsel Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/19 10:11 AM
MOTION Request for Court Appointed Council, APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court (AO 240) Forma Pauperis, Pro Se Litigant - by Plaintiff Yasushi Kaleohano-Arakaki (eta) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Supplement
Tue 03/19 10:09 AM
STATEMENT of Claim re1 Complaint - by Yasushi Kaleohano-Arakaki. (eta) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 03/19 10:07 AM
CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Yasushi Kaleohano-Arakaki. (eta) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/19 10:05 AM
COMPLAINT for a Civil Case; Jury Trial Requested against All Defendants - filed by Yasushi Kaleohano-Arakaki.(eta) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Documentation |