Black Oak Capital BOCA v. Paul Evans et al
Utah District Court | |
Judge: | David Barlow |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00209 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 19, 2024 5:08 PM MDT |
Defendant
Evan Fript
|
|
Defendant
Paul Evans, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Black Oak Capital BOCA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Report Regarding Patent and Trademark
Wed 03/20 12:42 PM
Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (kec) (kec) |
|
Att: 1 (3/20/2024) Complaint | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Wed 03/20 8:40 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Paul Evans, LLC. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Wed 03/20 8:39 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Evan Fript. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet JS44
Wed 03/20 7:54 AM
Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) re1 Complaint Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts[LINK:PDF version] and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance, filed by Black Oak Capital BOCA, LLC. (Neilson, Darren) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re1 Complaint. The Civil Cover Sheet is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a complete Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule DUCivR3-4. Counsel must file a complete Civil Cover Sheet JS44 immediately. (kec) | |
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Tue 03/19 4:23 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Black Oak Capital BOCA, LLC. (Notice generated by Clerk's office) Form due by 4/9/2024. (kec) |
|
1 | 1
11
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Atty)
Tue 03/19 3:53 PM
COMPLAINT against Evan Fript, Paul Evans, LLC (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number BUTDC-5005207) filed by Black Oak Capital BOCA, LLC. (Neilson, Darren) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 03/19 4:22 PM
Judge David Barlow added. Case number will now read 2:24-cv-00209-DBB. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (kec) |
||
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Tue 03/19 4:31 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re1 Complaint. The Civil Cover Sheet is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a complete Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule DUCivR3-4. Counsel must file a complete Civil Cover Sheet JS44 immediately. (kec) |