California Northern District Court
Judge:Charles R Breyer
Case #: 3:24-cv-01713
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2024
Terminated:May 16, 2024
Case in other court:County of Alameda, Superior Court-Small Claims, 24SC064321
Last checked: Sunday Sep 15, 2024 2:30 AM PDT
Defendant
Comenity Servicing LLC
Represented By
Nathan Andrew Searles
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Tomio Buck Narita
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter D Wagner
519 S. Second Ave., Unit B
Covina, CA 91723


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, May 17, 2024
16 16 order Judgment Fri 05/17 11:19 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/17/2024. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
15 15 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/16 3:03 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Peter D Wagner. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Objection Thu 05/16 3:02 PM
OBJECTION to Jurisdiction of USDC to Hear the "State Case" for Lack of Jurisdiction Here, Demand to Remand by Peter D Wagner.(dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order Wed 05/15 4:54 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/15/2024. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
12 12 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 05/07 5:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Comenity Servicing LLC re 10 Clerk's Notice,11 Order, (Searles, Nathan)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order Tue 05/07 3:14 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/7/2024. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Tue 05/07 11:34 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION TO DISMISS hearing set for May 10, 2024 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/16 11:56 AM
NOTICE by Comenity Servicing LLC re8 Certificate of Service,7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint of No Opposition Received from Plaintiff(Searles, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Thursday, March 28, 2024
8 8 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 03/28 12:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Comenity Servicing LLC re7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Searles, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
7 7 motion Dismiss Tue 03/26 10:53 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Comenity Servicing LLC. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 5/10/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. Responses due by 4/9/2024. Replies due by 4/16/2024. (Searles, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
6 6 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 03/22 10:07 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Comenity Servicing LLC re1 Notice of Removal,2 Civil Cover Sheet,5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,, 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Searles, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 03/20 9:45 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2024 08:30 AM in San Francisco, - To be held by Zoom.(dhm, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 03/19 4:04 PM
Case assigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 03/19 4:02 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Comenity Servicing LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bread Financial Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Bread Financial Payments, Inc. for Comenity Servicing LLC. (Searles, Nathan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 03/19 3:56 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Comenity Servicing LLC . (Searles, Nathan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 03/19 3:44 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County, Superior Court-Small Claims. Their case number is 24SC064321. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19237218). Filed by Comenity Servicing LLC.(Searles, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 B
utility Electronic Filing Error Tue 03/19 3:51 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Civil Cover Sheet missing. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re:1 Notice of Removal, filed by Comenity Servicing LLC (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]