Aaro v. Tri Star Freight System, Inc. et al
New Mexico District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer M Rozzoni |
Referred: | Magistrate Jud Gregory B Wormuth |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00270 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Second Judicial District Court, D-202-CV-24-00583 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 19, 2024 6:08 PM MDT |
Defendant
Jose Sanchez
|
|
Defendant
Tri Star Freight System, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rena Aaro
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 87 minutes ago |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
7 | 7 NOTICE by Tri Star Freight System, Inc. (Carroll, Darci) | |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE by Tri Star Freight System, Inc. (Carroll, Darci) | |
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9274233 re1 Notice of Removal (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Carroll, Darci) | ||
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tri Star Freight System, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Tri Star Freight System, Inc. for Tri Star Freight System, Inc.. (Carroll, Darci) | |
4 | 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Tri Star Freight System, Inc.. (Carroll, Darci) | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Darci A Carroll on behalf of Tri Star Freight System, Inc. (Carroll, Darci) | |
2 | 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tri Star Freight System Inc. from Second Judicial Court, case number D-202-CV-2024-00583. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Tri Star Freight System Inc.. (Carroll, Darci) | |
United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni and United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (eh) | ||
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh) |