Veale v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Myong J Joun |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10449 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 20, 2024 12:28 AM EDT |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
|
|
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase & Co.
|
|
Defendant
United Consumer Finance, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Uplift, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Venturcap Financial Group, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Akira Veale
11 High Street Suite 2
Milton, MA 02186 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/19 1:32 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by JPMorgan Chase & Co..(Mook, Darrell) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/18 11:46 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Robertson, Christopher) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/18 11:45 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax Information Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services LLC.. (Robertson, Christopher) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/18 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher F. Robertson on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC (Robertson, Christopher) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Sat 04/06 10:12 AM
Motion to Dismiss by Uplift, Inc.. (York, Steve) |
|
Att: 1 Answer and Stipulation, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 04/01 9:49 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Akira Veale. United Consumer Finance, Inc. served on 3/28/2024, answer due 4/18/2024. Acknowledgement filed by Akira Veale. (Dore, Samantha) |
|
7 | 7
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 04/01 9:48 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Akira Veale. JPMorgan Chase & Co. served on 3/28/2024, answer due 4/18/2024. Acknowledgement filed by Akira Veale. (Dore, Samantha) |
|
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 04/01 9:47 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Akira Veale. Equifax Information Services LLC served on 3/28/2024, answer due 4/18/2024. Acknowledgement filed by Akira Veale. (Dore, Samantha) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Copy Mailed
Wed 03/20 4:46 PM
Copy of1 Complaint, and4 Summons Issued, given in hand to Filer Akira Veale on 3/19/2024 by customer service staff. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/19 11:30 AM
Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., United Consumer Finance, Inc., Uplift, Inc., Venturcap Financial Group, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Filing Fee/Payment Received
Tue 03/19 11:28 AM
Filing fee/payment: $ 405, receipt number 100006963 for1 Complaint, (Martin, Jacqueline) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Tue 03/19 11:03 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Myong J. Joun assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Cook, Savannah) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/19 10:51 AM
COMPLAINT against Uplift, Inc., Venturcap Financial Group, LLC, United Consumer Finance, Inc., Equifax Information Services LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., filed by Akira Veale.. Attachment 3 restricted due to containing personal identifier. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) |
|
Att: 1 Category Form & Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A |