McLean v. American United Life Insurance
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Paul L Maloney |
Referred: | Ray Kent |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00292 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 20, 2024 12:28 AM EDT |
consol plaintiff
neal wilensky
|
Represented By
|
defendant
American United Life Insurance Company
|
|
plaintiff
lakeisha mcclain
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/20 12:20 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant American United Life Insurance (ems) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Notice Regarding Assignment of Case
Wed 03/20 12:16 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Paul L. Maloney (ems) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/19 5:06 PM
COMPLAINT against American United Life Insurance Company filed by neal wilensky (Wilensky, Neal) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
misc
Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment
Tue 03/19 5:08 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by consol plaintiff neal wilensky in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7324775 (Wilensky, Neal) |