Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Case #: 2:24-cv-00199
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2024
Terminated:Oct 09, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 15, 2024 3:50 AM CDT
Defendant
Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By
Melissa Richards Smith
Gillam & Smith, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.
Represented By
Melissa Richards Smith
Gillam & Smith, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Illumidine, Inc.
Represented By
Carey Matthew Rozier
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
Jonathan Lloyd Hardt
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
James Francis McDonough, III
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info
Kristin M. Whidby
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 59 minutes ago
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
26 26 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Wed 10/09 1:40 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (NKL)
Related: [-]
25 25 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 10/09 1:35 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/8/2024. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
24 24 3 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 10/04 6:16 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Illumidine, Inc.. (Hardt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 09/30 2:15 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Extend Stay of All Deadlines. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/30/2024. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
22 22 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 09/24 9:25 PM
JOINT MOTION To Extend Stay Of All Deadlines re19 Order on Motion to Stay,21 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (6 days requested; up to September 30, 2024) by Illumidine, Inc..(Hardt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, September 13, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 09/13 3:51 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Extend Stay. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 09/13/2024. (KLC)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
20 20 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 09/09 9:23 PM
JOINT MOTION Extend Stay Of All Deadlines re19 Order on Motion to Stay (by an additional 15 days, up to and including September 24, 2024) by Illumidine, Inc..(Hardt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, August 09, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 08/09 12:06 PM
ORDER granting18 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/9/2024. (CH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
18 18 motion Stay Thu 08/08 8:36 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Illumidine, Inc..(Hardt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, August 05, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 08/05 11:05 AM
ORDER granting16 JOINT MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/5/2024. (CH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
16 16 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 08/01 4:33 PM
JOINT MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd..(Smith, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, July 18, 2024
minutes Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference Fri 07/19 12:21 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference/Case Management Conference held on 7/18/2024. Counsel for the parties appeared. Court asked whether the parties consented to trial before the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Court proceeded to provide counsel with Claim Construction and Jury Selection/Trial dates. (Court Reporter Shawn McRoberts) (aeb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
15 15 misc Jury Demand Mon 07/15 12:26 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Smith, Melissa)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Mon 07/15 12:25 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. (Smith, Melissa)
Related: [-]
13 13 18 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/15 12:24 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd..(Smith, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Compliance Mon 07/08 5:37 PM
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by Illumidine, Inc. With P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Hardt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order/Docket Control Order Thu 06/27 8:56 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Scheduling/Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2024 at 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/26/2024. (CH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 04/03 10:03 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re9 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE REQUIREMENT Samsung Electronics America, Inc. answer due 7/15/2024; Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. answer due 7/15/2024. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/2/2024. (CH)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 04/01 9:56 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND WAIVER OF FOREIGN SERVICE REQUIREMENT by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd..(Smith, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/27 4:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Illumidine, Inc.. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 3/25/2024. (Hardt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 03/20 7:34 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd..(ch, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional Attachment(s)
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 03/20 7:03 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristin M. Whidby on behalf of Illumidine, Inc. (Whidby, Kristin)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/20 7:32 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Wed 03/20 7:33 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (ch, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 03/19 10:39 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carey Matthew Rozier on behalf of Illumidine, Inc. (Rozier, Carey)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 03/19 10:37 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Francis McDonough, III on behalf of Illumidine, Inc. (McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Tue 03/19 10:34 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hardt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Tue 03/19 10:28 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Illumidine, Inc. (Hardt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/19 10:23 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10039181.), filed by Illumidine, Inc..(Hardt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Samsung NE63*895*S User Manual,
Att: 2 Exhibit B. Samsung NZ30A3060UK User Manual,
Att: 3 Exhibit C. Samsung NZ36C3060UK User Manual,
Att: 4 Exhibit D. Samsung NE63T8951SS Specification Sheet,
Att: 5 Exhibit E. Samsung NZ30A3060UK Specification Sheet,
Att: 6 Exhibit F. Samsung NZ36K7880US Specification Sheet,
Att: 7 Exhibit G. Dacor DTI36M977BB / DTI30M977BB User Manual,
Att: 8 Exhibit H. Dacor DTI30M977BB/DA Specification Sheet,
Att: 9 Exhibit I. Preliminary and Exemplary Claim Chart Demonstrating Infringement of At Least Claim 1 of the '249 Patent,
Att: 10 Exhibit J. Preliminary and Exemplary Claim Chart Demonstrating Infringement of At Least Claim 1 of the '853 Patent,
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet